This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 08:31:39 (UTC).

Chapman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Chapman filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01858

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alicia Chapman

Defendants

Commissioner of Social Security

United States Attorney District of Nevada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martin Muckleroy

6077 S Fort Apache Rd, Suite 140

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Kevin S. Kerr

Attorney at Sclmeider, Kel'r & Robichaux

Po Box 14490

Portland, OR 97293

Defendant Attorney

Daniel P. Talbert

160 Spear Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin S. Kerr for Alicia Chapman and approving Designation of Local Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. #6 ) shall proceed against Defendant.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. #6 ).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail to: (1) Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear Street, Suite 800, San Francisco, CA 94105, and (2) the Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Washington DC 20530.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue Summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the Summons and Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have sixty (60) court days from the date of service to file his answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Plaintiff shall include with the original paper submitted for filing a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of the document was mailed to Defendant. The Court may disregard any paper received by a district judge, magistrate judge, or the Clerk of the Court which fails to include a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - summons and amended complaint sent by certified mail to SSA and US AG; by email to USM - HAM) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #2 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff must file her amended complaint correcting the deficiencies noted above within thirty (30) court days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that if she files an amended complaint, her Complaint (ECF No. #2 ) no longer serves any function in this case. As such, the amended complaint must be complete in and of itself without reference to prior pleadings or other documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin S. Kerr for Alicia Chapman and approving Designation of Local Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Alicia Chapman. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Oregon Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Washington Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Supplement to #8) (Muckleroy, Martin) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Talbert, Daniel) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT by United States Attorney District of Nevada re #6 Amended Complaint, #9 Summons Issued as to USA. (HAM) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States Attorney District of Nevada served on 10/15/2020. (HAM) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS re service of #6 Amended Complaint and #9 Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel (#7018 3090 0001 1163 9313) and the Attorney General of the United States (#7018 3090 0001 1163 9306). (HAM) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/14/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on the Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel (ECF No. 7) is DEFERRED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Kevin S. Kerr, shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on page 2, paragraph 3 of the Verified Petition.Petitioner shall have 21 days from the entry of this Order to file a corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (HAM) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. #6 ) shall proceed against Defendant.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. #6 ).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the Summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail to: (1) Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear Street, Suite 800, San Francisco, CA 94105, and (2) the Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Washington DC 20530.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue Summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the Summons and Amended Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have sixty (60) court days from the date of service to file his answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Plaintiff shall include with the original paper submitted for filing a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of the document was mailed to Defendant. The Court may disregard any paper received by a district judge, magistrate judge, or the Clerk of the Court which fails to include a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - summons and amended complaint sent by certified mail to SSA and US AG; by email to USM - HAM) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) View Corrected Image #15 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin S. Kerr and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Martin A. Muckleroy (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6209346) by Plaintiff Alicia Chapman. (Muckleroy, Martin) Modified on 11/5/2020 (EDS). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Alicia Chapman. No changes to parties. (Muckleroy, Martin) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #2 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, Plaintiff must file her amended complaint correcting the deficiencies noted above within thirty (30) court days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that if she files an amended complaint, her Complaint (ECF No. #2 ) no longer serves any function in this case. As such, the amended complaint must be complete in and of itself without reference to prior pleadings or other documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment to MJ) (HAM) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6200122) by Alicia Chapman. Proof of service due by 1/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Muckleroy, Martin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 10/6/2020 (HAM). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alicia Chapman. (Muckleroy, Martin) Modified on 10/6/2020 (HAM). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin A. Muckleroy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin S Kerr