This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2020 at 08:10:18 (UTC).

Chapman et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Chapman filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lana Chapman

Robert Chapman

Defendant

American Medical Systems, Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Britt Alicia Birkenbuel

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

Suite 500, 2125 Western Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

Karolina S. Kulesza

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

331 South 600 East

Salt Lake City, UT 84102

Jason Murphy

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

Suite 500, 2125 Western Avenue

Seattle, WA 98121

Jason M. Murphy

Attorney at DRIGGS, BILLS & DAY PLLC

2125 Western Avenue, Suite 500

Seattle, WA 98121

Defendant Attorneys

Erik W. Legg

Attorney at FARRELL WHITE & LEGG

P. O. Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Barbara R. Binis

Attorney at REED SMITH

Three Logan Square, Suite 3100, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael J. Farrell

Attorney at FARRELL WHITE & LEGG

P. O. Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Stephen J. McConnell

Attorney at REED SMITH

Three Logan Square, Suite 3100, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Brandon Wayne Lobberecht

Attorney at BETTY NEUMAN & MCMAHON PLC

1900 East 54Th Street

Davenport, IA 52807

Martha L Shaff

Attorney at BETTY NEUMAN & MCMAHON PLC

1900 East 54Th Street

Davenport, IA 52807

 

Court Documents

#52

#51

#50

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#49

#48

47 #1

*Restricted*

#47

#46

45 #40

ECF 6787 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Galoway

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

160 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) TEXT ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice pursuant to MDL Rule 2.1(c), waiving the associate counsel requirement of LR 83(d)(4), and waiving the pro hac vice filing fee of LR 83(d)(3). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/9/2020. (k) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Wayne Lobberecht on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc., (Lobberecht, Brandon) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE of Appearance by Martha L Shaff on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc., (Shaff, Martha) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 3/23/2020. (kmc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ***MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, WAIVE LOCAL COUNSEL AND FEE*** MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lana Chapman, Robert Chapman.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 3/6/2020. (Murphy, Jason) Modified on 2/25/2020 (kjw). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) CLERK'S NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS/PRO SE PARTY: Your case has been opened in the SDIA and assigned a new case number. Please review the attached document and forms for compliance with this Court's Local Rules. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/20/2020. (slg) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketJudge Stephanie M. Rose and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. (slg) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-13621. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jason Murphy on behalf of Lana Chapman, Robert Chapman. (Murphy, Jason) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02325 - American Medical Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 ECF 204 - PTO 12, #2 ECF 231 - PTO 13, #3 ECF 241 - Notice Pltfs Request for Production, #4 ECF 244 - PTO 14, #5 ECF 245 - Master Long Form Complaint & Jury Demand, #6 ECF 246 Master Short Form Complaint, #7 ECF 247 - AMS Answer, #8 ECF 261 - PTO 15, #9 ECF 288 - PTO 17, #10 ECF 302 - PTO 19, #11 ECF 326 - PTO 24, #12 ECF 423 - PTO 40, #13 ECF 469 - PTO 41, #14 ECF 500 - PTO 47, #15 ECF 554 - PTO 54, #16 ECF 662 - PTO 63, #17 ECF 715 - PTO 70, #18 ECF 748 - PTO 73, #19 ECF 749 - PTO 74, #20 ECF 1086 - PTO 116, #21 ECF 1129 - PTO 118, #22 ECF 1209 - PTO 158, #23 ECF 1234 - PTO 171, #24 ECF 1981 PTO - 202, #25 ECF 3216 -PTO 223, #26 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #27 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #28 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #29 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #30 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #31 ECF 3263 - Motion & Memorandum by Pltfs to Compel Production, #32 ECF 3274 - Certification of Compiance with PTO 223, #33 ECF 3320 - Partial Opposition by AMS to 3263 Motion, #34 ECF 3370 - Pltfs Reply re 3320 Opposition, #35 ECF 3532 - Motion by All Pltfs for Protective Order, #36 ECF 3534 - Suggestion by All Pltfs in support of 3532, #37 ECF 3563 - Opposition by AMS to 3532 Motion, #38 ECF 3592 - Order Granting 3532 Motion Protective Order, #39 ECF 4220 - PTO 238, #40 ECF 6787 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Galoway, #41 ECF 6787 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Galoway, #42 ECF 6787 Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Galoway, #43 ECF 7137 - PTO 274, #44 ECF 7410 - Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude May, #45 ECF 7441 - Notice of Joint Venue Recommendations, #46 ECF 7463 - AMS Motion to Exclude Galloway, #47 ECF 7464 - AMS Memo ISO Motion to Exclude Galloway, #48 ECF 7469 - AMS Motion to Exclude Guelcher, #49 ECF 7470 - AMS Brief ISO Motion to Exclude Guelcher, #50 ECF 7475 - AMS Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #51 ECF 7477 - AMS Motion to Exclude Mays, #52 ECF 7478 - AMS Brief ISO Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #53 ECF 7480 - AMS Brief ISO Motion to Exclude Mays, #54 ECF 7481 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #55 ECF 7493 -Pltfs Notice of Adoption of Prior Response Galloway, #56 ECF 7496 - AMS Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #57 ECF 7496 - AMS Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #58 ECF 7496 - AMS Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #59 ECF 7496 - AMS Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion (Badylak, Becker, Coad and Kozak), #60 ECF 7500 - Pltf Notice of Adoption of Prior Response Guelcher, #61 ECF 7501 - Notice Of Adoption Of Pltfs Prior Memoranda Of Law And Sur-reply ISO Opposition to Motion to Exlcude Rosenzweig, #62 ECF 7505 - Defendant Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Guelcher, #63 ECF 7506 - Reply Brief re AMS Motion to Exclude Galloway, #64 ECF 7512 - Reply of AMS re Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, #65 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #66 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #67 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #68 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #69 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #70 ECF 7552 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Guelcher, #71 ECF 7553 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Mays, #72 ECF 7553 - Notice of Adoption of Prior Response in OppositionMotion to Exclude Mays)(Birkenbuel, Britt) (Modified on 2/19/2020 to add party filer)(slr). (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2325 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2325 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases on inactive docket) (kp) (ADI) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL AMS Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL AMS Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL AMS Inactive") (lca) (ADI) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2325 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2325 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases on inactive docket). (mek) (ADI) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and American Medical Systems have reached a settlement with regard to AMS. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and AMS may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 5/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4714 in MDL Case No. 2325 AMS. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/24/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Lana Chapman, Robert Chapman. (Kulesza, Karolina) (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRETRIAL ORDER # 223 (Order re: Production of Case-Specific Information For Certain AMS MDL Plaintiffs) It is directed as follows: A) Existing Cases pending as of October 10, 2016. This order applies to certain cases in MDL 2325 alleging claim(s) against AMS, as of 10/10/2016, and listed on Exhibit A. B) Plaintiff Fact Sheets, Authorizations and Documents. Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A shall submit a full and complete PFS with verifications and the attached authorizations and the other documents identified herein to the individuals identified in Paragraph C by 11/21/2016, as more fully set forth herein. D) This PTO does not in any way relieve plaintiffs from their obligation to serve a Plaintiff Profile Form; and E) Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/21/2016. (cc: Clerk of JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kll) (Entered: 10/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) (Entered: 10/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 199 (Order Establishing Reporting on Payment to the MDL 2325 Fund) entered on 09/16/2015 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (kp) (Entered: 10/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4148681. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jk) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEPHEN J. MCCONNELL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara R. Binis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erik W Legg