This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2019 at 09:29:48 (UTC).

Chaplin v. Bauman

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 Chaplin filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Bauman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mona K. Majzoub and Sean F. Cox. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12205

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mona K. Majzoub

Presiding Judge

Sean F. Cox

 

Party Details

Petitioner

David Kent Chaplin

Newberry, MI 49868

Respondent

Catherine Bauman

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Document Continuation

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#4

(#4) OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Kent Chaplin against Catherine Bauman. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation) (DAll) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

1 #1

Document Continuation

#2

(#2) ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 8/20/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Judgment on David Kent Chaplin, Pris. No. 972233, NEWBERRY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY,13747 E. County Road 428, NEWBERRY, MI 49868. (JMcC) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGMENT Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order Dismissing Case on David David Kent Chaplin, Pris. No. 972233, NEWBERRY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY,13747 E. County Road 428, NEWBERRY, MI 49868 (JMcC) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER to Correct Deficiency for failure to submit filing fee. Correction due by 8/20/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by David Kent Chaplin against Catherine Bauman. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation) (DAll) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less