This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2022 at 08:27:28 (UTC).

Chapin v. Kent Intermediate School District

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Chapin filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Kent Intermediate School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00370

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina J. Chapin

Defendant

Kent Intermediate School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H. Rhett Pinsky

Attorney at Pinsky Smith Fayette & Kennedy LLP

146 Monroe Ctr. St., Nw, Ste. 805

Grand Rapids, MI 49503-2824

Crystal J. Bultje

Attorney at Pinsky Smith Fayette & Kennedy LLP

146 Monroe Ctr. St., Nw, Ste. 805

Grand Rapids, MI 49503-2824

Defendant Attorneys

Timothy J. Mullins

Attorney at Giarmarco Mullins & Horton PC

101 W Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Fl.

Troy, MI 48084-5280

Travis Mark Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco Mullins & Horton PC

101 W Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Fl.

Troy, MI 48084-5280

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kent Intermediate School District filed by Christina J Chapin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #2 Summons) (Bultje, Crystal) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - EEOC Right to Sue Letter

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Kent Intermediate School District (ns) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Christina J. Chapin as to Kent Intermediate School District waiver sent on 4/26/2022, answer due 6/27/2022 (Bultje, Crystal) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Travis Mark Comstock on behalf of defendant Kent Intermediate School District (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of defendant Kent Intermediate School District (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Christina J. Chapin as to Kent Intermediate School District waiver sent on 4/26/2022, answer due 6/27/2022 (Bultje, Crystal) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Kent Intermediate School District (ns) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number AMIWDC-6726540; filing fee paid by attorney Crystal J. Bultje on behalf of plaintiff (jjm) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of H. Rhett Pinsky on behalf of plaintiff Christina J Chapin (Pinsky, H.) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kent Intermediate School District filed by Christina J Chapin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #2 Summons) (Bultje, Crystal) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Travis M. Comstock

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy J Mullins