This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/12/2020 at 13:12:41 (UTC).

Chapagai v. Hertz Corporation, The

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 Chapagai filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hertz Corporation, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01047

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yam P Chapagai

Yam P. Chapagai

Defendant

Hertz Corporation, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David James Meretta

Attorney at Miller & Law, P.C.

1900 West Littleton Boulevard

Littleton, CO 80120

Defendant Attorneys

Jim Goh

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP-Denver

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

Erin Rayner Mangum

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP-Denver

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY of The Hertz Corporation by Defendant Hertz Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jim Goh on behalf of Hertz Corporation, TheAttorney Jim Goh added to party Hertz Corporation, The(pty:dft) (Goh, Jim) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Erin Rayner Mangum added to party Hertz Corporation, The(pty:dft) by Hertz Corporation, The.(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yam P. Chapagai. Hertz Corporation, The served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Meretta, David) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hertz Corporation, The (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7249632)Attorney David James Meretta added to party Yam P Chapagai(pty:pla), filed by Yam P Chapagai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Meretta, David) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY of The Hertz Corporation by Defendant Hertz Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jim Goh on behalf of Hertz Corporation, TheAttorney Jim Goh added to party Hertz Corporation, The(pty:dft) (Goh, Jim) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Erin Rayner Mangum added to party Hertz Corporation, The(pty:dft) by Hertz Corporation, The.(Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 6/18/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/11/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3-1) is due 6/11/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/1/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yam P. Chapagai. Hertz Corporation, The served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Meretta, David) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hertz Corporation, The (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7249632)Attorney David James Meretta added to party Yam P Chapagai(pty:pla), filed by Yam P Chapagai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Meretta, David) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin R. Mangum