This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2021 at 10:27:23 (UTC).

Chapa v. Kenton County Judge Executive et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 Chapa filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kenton County Judge Executive. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are P SO, David L. Bunning and Matthew A. Stinnett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

Referral Judges

P SO

Matthew A. Stinnett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Ricardo Chapa

Covington, KY 41017

Defendants

Board Members of the Kenton County Fiscal Court

Southern Health Partners

Kenton County Judge Executive

Jailer Kenton County Detention Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Judd R. Uhl

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Lexington

2333 Alexandria Drive

Lexington, KY 40504

Bradley S. Fyffe

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP - Cincinnati

250 E. Fifth Street, Suite 2000

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Christopher Scott Nordloh

Attorney at Kenton County Attorney

1840 Simon Kenton Way, Room 4200

Covington, KY 41011

 

Court Documents

#18

#16

#15

14 #1

Envelope Post Marked 4/13/21

#14

12 #1

Envelope Post Marked 3/26/21

8 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Sample Caption Page

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2-State Court Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit 1-State Court Docket-Filings

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: The parties shall have up to and including May 24, 2021, in which to file their respective discovery schedule and plans. The plans shall include and/or address: 1) Issues that will require discovery;2) A proposed timeline for completing discovery; 3) Whether interrogatories and requests for production of documents are necessary, and if so, the maximum number of interrogatories and requests for production of documents by each party to another party, along with proposed deadlines for answers;4) Whether requests for admissions are necessary, and if so, the maximum number of requests for admissions, along with proposed response deadlines; 5) Whether depositions are necessary, and, if so, the maximum number of depositions for each party and proposed time limits for each deposition; 6) Final dates to amend pleading or to join parties; 7) Proposed deadline to file dispositive motions; and 8) Expected trial length, in days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett on 4/23/21.(KRB)cc: CORand Gregory R. Chapa by US Mail (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett for review: #5 Answer to Complaint (KRB) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Matthew A. Stinnett added. P SO no longer assigned to case. (KRB) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: (1) The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Southern Health Partners #8 is GRANTED, and the claims against it are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE;(2) This matter is REFERRED to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b) to conduct all pretrial proceedings, including preparing proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law on any dispositive motions; and (3) The Clerk of the Court shall ASSIGN this matter to a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 4/19/2021.(KRB)cc: CORand Gregory R. Chapa by US Mail (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to #8 , #14 in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Southern Health Partners. (Uhl, Judd) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Southern Health Partners filed by Gregory Ricardo Chapa. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Post Marked 4/13/21)(KRB) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER:(1) Plaintiff Gregory Ricardo Chapas Motion for Extension of Time #12 is GRANTED as set forth below;(2) Chapa shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss #8 not later than April 16, 2021; and (3) Defendant shall file any reply within 14 days after the response is filed. At that time the briefing upon the Motion shall be CLOSED and the matter will stand submitted for decision.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 3/31/2021.(KRB)cc: CORand Gregory R. Chapa by US Mail (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time by Gregory Ricardo Chapa Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Post Marked 3/26/21)(KRB) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER as to Gregory Ricardo Chapa: The Plaintiff Gregory Ricardo Chapa's Objection to Defendants Notice of Removal #10 is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 3/16/2021.(SLG)cc: CORand Gregory Ricardo Chapa by US Mail (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of District Judge David L. Bunning for review: #10 Objections (KRB) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OBJECTIONS to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Gregory Ricardo Chapa, Pro Se (Attachments: #1 Envelope Post Marked 3-8-21)(KRB) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: (1) Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss #8 within 21 days; and (2) Defendant shall file any reply within 14 days after the response is filed. At that time the briefing upon the Motion shall be CLOSED and the matter will stand submitted for decision.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 03/05/2021.(KRB)cc: CORand Gregory Ricardo Chapa by US Mail (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Southern Health Partners (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Uhl, Judd) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southern Health Partners. (Uhl, Judd) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Judd Uhl. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Southern Health Partners without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Kenton County, Kentucky and Judge Executive Kris Knochelmann individually and in official capacity by Kenton County Judge Executive.(Nordloh, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenton County Judge Executive. (Nordloh, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketConflict Check run. (ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-01051. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4902954), filed by Southern Health Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket-Filings, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern Health Partners, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley S. Fyffe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Scott Nordloh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Judd R. Uhl