This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 13:37:20 (UTC).

Chang Eui Bong v. Abba Trading Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Chang Eui Bong filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Abba Trading Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00199

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chang Eui Bong

Defendants

ABBA TRADING CORP.

LUXMANA LLC

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

Abba Trading Corp. doing business as Mister Bossam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Hyunjong Hong

Defendant Attorney

Jeff A Mann

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

12 #1

Proposed Order

#13

13 #1

Proposed Order Notice of Stay of Proceedings

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Proceedings Abba Trading Corp., Does, Luxmana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Notice of Stay of Proceedings) (Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party Does(pty:dft)) (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) First APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Chang Eui Bong Abba Trading Corp., Luxmana LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party Abba Trading Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party Luxmana LLC(pty:dft)) (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file their Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with a completed Exhibit A, by 4/8/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) #8 was docketed on this case in error, should have been under CV 19-00299-ODW(JEM) Garcia vs Broadway Triangle. (lc) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lc) Modified on 1/16/2019 (lc). (DOCKETED ON THIS CASE IN ERROR, SEE CLERICAL ERROR DOCKET NO. 9) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Abba Trading Corp., Luxmana LLC. (lh) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chang Eui Bong, (Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chang Eui Bong. (Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Chang Eui Bong. (Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23016351 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Chang Eui Bong. (Attorney Kevin Hyunjong Hong added to party Chang Eui Bong(pty:pla))(Hong, Kevin) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less