This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2019 at 07:38:07 (UTC).

Chaney v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Chaney filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04145

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rene Chaney

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendants

Tobacco and Wireless Sales LLC

Hilliard Smoke House

JUUL Labs, Inc.

Mohammad Shalash

Mohammed Shalash

John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-13

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shawn Kincade Judge

Attorney at Isaac Wiles Burkholder Teetor LLC

Two Miranova Place, Ste. 700

Columbus, OH 43215

Gregory M Travalio

Attorney at Isaac, Wiles, Burkholder & Teetor, LLP

Two Miranova Place, Suite 700

Columbus, OH 43215

Mark H Troutman

Attorney at Isaac Wiles Burkholder & Teetor LLC

Suite 700, Two Miranova Place

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Mark J. Miller

Attorney at Shaw and Miller, Attorneys at Law

555 City Park Avenue

Columbus, OH 43215

Aneca E Lasley

Attorney at Squire Sanders (US) LLP

2000 Huntington Center, 41 S High Street

Columbus, OH 43215-6106

Jesse L. Taylor

2000 Huntington Center, 41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#17

16 #3

Exhibit C

16 #2

Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

#15

14 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

10 #1

Exhibit A - Defendant Juul Labs, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss

#10

6 #2

Exhibit B

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Shalash Declaration

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Stay; holding in abeyance #10 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/31/2019. (ew) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Rene Chaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Troutman, Mark) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTATION ORDER finding as moot #15 Motion to Strike - Plaintiff's counsel spoke with chambers and agreed to withdraw the Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/15/19. (jr) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Strike #14 Reply to Response to Motion, #13 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Rene Chaney. (Troutman, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination filed by Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Lasley, Aneca) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Lasley, Aneca) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 and #9 Motion for Extension of Time: Defendants' answer deadline is STAYED pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Response to #10 Motion to Remand due by 10/14/2019; Reply due 7 days thereafter. Reply to #6 Motion to Stay due by 10/14/2019. The Court DIRECTS the parties to update the Court, as they have thus far, regarding any JPML determinations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/7/2019. (ew) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination, #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiff Rene Chaney. (Troutman, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Rene Chaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant Juul Labs, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss) (Troutman, Mark) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/30/2019. by Defendant Mohammed Shalash. (Miller, Mark) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. re #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination - Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Lasley, Aneca) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson: Status Conference held on 10/1/2019. (jr) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/1/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Counsel are directed to join together on one line and call the Court at 614-719-3470. (jr) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Lasley, Aneca) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Lasley, Aneca) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Lasley, Aneca) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Removal) (Lasley, Aneca) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JUUL Labs, Inc.; Tobacco and Wireless Sales LLC; Mohammed Shalash; Hilliard Smoke House; and John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-13 originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 8/28/2019 by Rene Chaney. (ew) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against JUUL Labs, Inc.; Tobacco and Wireless Sales LLC; and John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-13 originally filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on 8/14/2019 by Rene Chaney. (ew) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19cv006611 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7114219), filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Shalash Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Lasley, Aneca) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUUL Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn Kincade Judge

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M. Travalio

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark H Troutman