This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 09:57:18 (UTC).

Chaney v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Chaney filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Herman N Johnson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00675

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Chaney

Defendant

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bennett L Pugh

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BENNETT L. PUGH

300 North Montgomery Avenue

Sheffield, AL 35660

James Wilson Mitchell

Attorney at MITCHELL, BURDINE & BERNAUER

1905 Bruin Drive

Florence, AL 35630

Defendant Attorney

Thomas E Bazemore, III

Attorney at HUIE FERNAMBUCQ & STEWART LLP

3291 Us Highway 280, Suite 200

Birmingham, AL 35243-4109

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/15/20. (BJL) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/15/2021. Motions due by 4/15/2021. The parties shall be ready for trial to be scheduled after 4/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/15/20. (BJL) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jonathan Chaney and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (BJL) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bazemore, Thomas) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than June 29, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/13/20. (BJL) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/13/20. (BJL) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26 as more fully set out therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/13/20. (BJL) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3590341 (receipt number B4601105948). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from The Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Alabama, case number 41-CV-2020-900084. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(BJL). (Bazemore, Thomas) Modified on 5/15/2020 (BJL). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Bazemore, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Bazemore, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from The Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Alabama, case number 41-CV-2020-900084. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas E Bazemore, III