This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2022 at 07:52:24 (UTC).

CHAND et al v. MTN IRANCELL TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/27/2022 CHAND filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MTN IRANCELL TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00830

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SALLY CHAND

MICHAEL CHAND, JR.

CHRISTINA MAHON

RYAN CHAND

BRENDA CHAND

LISA RAMACI

ISABELL VINCENT

MASINA TULIAU

CYNTHIA PARLIN

SHARONDA PARLIN

JENNIFER LINK

JESSICA REW

SARA LILLY

RYAN HICKMAN

E.H.

SHARON JOHNSTON

TANJA KUHLMEIER

K.K.

ROBERT J. KUHLMEIER

THERESA A. KUHLMEIER

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan R. Sparacino

Attorney at SPARACINO PLLC

1920 L Street, Nw, Suite 535

Washington, DC 20036

Other Attorneys

Benjamin Sherwood Haley

173 Oxford Road, 7Th Floor, Johannesburg

David M. Zionts

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

Jordan L. Moran

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

Kimberly Zelnick

Attorney at FRESHFIELDS BRUCKHAUS DERINGER US LLP

601 Lexington Avenue, 31St Floor

New York, NY 10022

Scott A. Eisman

Attorney at FRESHFIELDS BRUCKHAUS DERINGER US LLP

601 Lexington Avenue, 31St Floor

New York, NY 10022

Timothy P. Harkness

Attorney at FRESHFIELDS BRUCKHAUS DERINGER US LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

19 #19

Main Document

18 #1

Exhibit A

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) ORDER adopting the #9 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order. Defendants' response due by July 7, 2022. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/29/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#16

(#16) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MTN GROUP LIMITED (Zionts, David) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Eisman on behalf of IRENE CHARNLEY, MTN GROUP LIMITED, PHUTHUMA NHLEKO (Eisman, Scott) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Zelnick on behalf of IRENE CHARNLEY, MTN GROUP LIMITED, PHUTHUMA NHLEKO (Zelnick, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#9

(#17) ORDER adopting the #9 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order. Defendants' response due by July 7, 2022. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/29/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Sparacino on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sparacino, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint motion for briefing schedule, Dkt. #19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that (1) MTN Defendants shall file their motion to transfer and their motion to dismiss on or before May 26, 2022; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to transfer on or before June 9, 2022; (3) MTN Defendants shall file their reply in support of transfer on or before June 16, 2022; (4) Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before July 18, 2022; and (5) MTN Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss on or before August 17, 2022. Finally, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion to dismiss shall not exceed 60 pages, the opposition to the motion to dismiss shall not exceed 60 pages, and the reply in support of the motion to dismiss shall not exceed 30 pages. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 05/25/2022. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue, Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memoranda of Points and Authorities in Support of and in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by IRENE CHARNLEY, MTN GROUP LIMITED, PHUTHUMA NHLEKO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zionts, David) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase directly reassigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss pursuant to minute order dated 5/13/2022 in 22-cv-829 (RDM). Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by IRENE CHARNLEY, MTN GROUP LIMITED, PHUTHUMA NHLEKO. Case related to Case No. 1:22-cv-00829. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zionts, David) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response due by 7/7/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER adopting the #9 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order. Defendants' response due by July 7, 2022. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/29/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MTN GROUP LIMITED (Zionts, David) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Eisman on behalf of IRENE CHARNLEY, MTN GROUP LIMITED, PHUTHUMA NHLEKO (Eisman, Scott) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Zelnick on behalf of IRENE CHARNLEY, MTN GROUP LIMITED, PHUTHUMA NHLEKO (Zelnick, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan L. Moran on behalf of IRENE CHARNLEY, MTN GROUP LIMITED, PHUTHUMA NHLEKO (Moran, Jordan) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting the #3 Motion for Waiver. The Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a complaint omitting the full residential address of each plaintiff, without prejudice to reconsideration after the Defendant notices its appearance. See attached ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/7/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corrected COMPLAINT against IRENE CHARNLEY, MTN GROUP LIMITED, MTN IRANCELL TELECOMMUNICATIONS SERVICES COMPANY, PHUTHUMA NHLEKO with Jury Demand filed by THERESA A. KUHLMEIER, DANNYEL CONTRERAS, JUDY COLLADO, RYAN CHAND, ALL PLAINTIFFS, TYLER J. NORAGER, DAVID KUHLMEIER, EDWARD M. KUHLMEIER, NOEL CONTRERAS, KURTISS LAMB, THOMAS KUHLMEIER, LISA RAMACI, JUSTIN A. WALDECK, JOHN KUHLMEIER, JONATHAN CONTRERAS, SR, SALLY CHAND, KAIYA COLLADO, SARAH LILLY, NORMA CONTRERAS, K. K., CARLOS CONTRERAS, SANDRA SOLIDAY, BRIAN TAYLOR, MICHAEL CHAND, JR, HERNAN CONTRERAS, JUDAS RECENDEZ, KEITH VEVERKA, BRENDA CHAND, TANJA REEVES KUHLMEIER, CHRISTINA MAHON, KARAR ADEL ALABSAWI, JENNIFER LINK, ISABELL VINCENT, CESAR CONTRERAS, E. H., PHYLLIS TAYLOR, CYNTHIA PARLIN, RYAN HICKMAN, SHARON JOHNSTON, JOHN TAYLOR, JAMES GMACHOWSKI, ROBERT J. KUHLMEIER, J. D. J. T., SHARONDA ANDERSON, CAROL POLLEY, JESSICA REW, RONALD VEVERKA, DOUGLAS VEVERKA, MASINA TULIAU, MICHELLE TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zeg) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting the #4 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk of Court is requested to docket the Plaintiffs' corrected complaint and accompanying exhibit. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/6/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/1/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmh) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Complaint by SALLY CHAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A)(Kay-Oliphant, Eli) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Ex Parte MOTION for Waiver of Local Civil Rule 5.1(c) by A.R., A.T., ADAM MAGERS, ALEX ROSA-VALENTIN, ALICIA MIXSON, AMI NEIBERGER, AMY RITCHIE, ANDRE BROWN, ANDREW LUKOW, ANGIE RYAN, ANITA BAKER, ANONA GONELLI, ANTHONY FARINA, ANTHONY M. GERBER, ARDELL THOMSEN, AUNDRA CRAIG, BARB THIEDE, BARBARA FARLEY, BEN REUBEN, BILLY JOHNSON, BILLY RYAN, BRANDEAUX CAMPBELL, BRANDON ARNOLD, BREE REUBEN, BRENDA CHAND, BRETT FARLEY, BRIAN G. TAYLOR, BRIAN J. CASEY, BRIDGET JUNEAU, BRITTANI HOBSON, BRITTANY HOGAN, BRUCE LUKOW, C.S., CAMERON FARLEY, CARL REIHER, CARLOS CONTRERAS, CAROL POLLEY, CARRIE THOMPSON, CASEY NICOLE REUBEN, CESAR CONTRERAS, SALLY CHAND, CHARLES B. GREGSTON, CHRIS FARLEY, CHRISTINA MAHON, CHRISTOPHER BOUTEN, CHRISTOPHER COT, CHRISTOPHER PACKER, CLIFFORD VAUGHN, COLLEEN CZAPLICKI, CRISTA MUNNS, CRYSTAL TUTWILER, CYNTHIA PARLIN, D.W., DAISY TUCKER, DANA SVENSON, DANIEL DUDEK, DANIEL PRICE, DANIEL THOMAS, JR., DANIEL THOMAS, SR., DANIELLE PACKER, DANNYEL CONTRERAS, DAVID ARNOLD, DAVID C. IVERSON, DAVID FARLEY, DAVID KUHLMEIER, DAVID THOMAS, DAVID WOODARD, DEBRA L. COOK-RUSSELL, DENISE JACKSON, DENNIS DEBRABANDER, DEREK STEPHENS, DIANA THOMAS, DONNA FARLEY, DOUGLAS VEVERKA, E.H., E.R., EDWARD HANLEY, EDWARD KUHLMEIER, ELENA SHAW, ELIZABETH MURPHY-SWEET, EMILY SHAW, EMMA MCGARRY, ERIC BILLITER, ERIC NEIBERGER, ERIN BOUTEN, ERIN DRUCTOR, EUGENE DELOZIER, EVAN D. BOGART, FRANCES ROBINSON, FRANCIS L. COT, GRANT VON LETKEMANN II, HERNAN CONTRERAS, ILIANA ROSA-VALENTIN, ISABELL VINCENT, J.D., J.D.J.T., J.M., J.R., JAMES GMACHOWSKI, JAMES REEVES, JAMES VAUGHN, JAMI LIN WILSON, JANET L. RIOS, JARED REEVES, JARED S. STEVENS, JASON ROBINSON, JASON RYAN, JEAN DAMMANN, JEANNINE VAUGHN, JENNIE MORIN, JENNIFER LINK, JEREMY D. SMITH, JESSICA FARLEY, JESSICA REW, JIMMY CONNOLLY, JOHN DAGGETT, JOHN K. TAYLOR, JOHN KIRBY, JOHN KUHLMEIER, JOHN MIXSON, JOHN ROBERT YOUNG, JOHNNY CASTILLO, JOHNNY WAYMAN ALEXANDER, JONATHAN CONTRERAS, SR., JONATHAN CRAIG, JONI REEVES, JOSE OLGUIN, JOSEPH MIXSON, JOSEPH PAUL LUKOW, JOSHUA P.G. WOLD, JOYCE CRAIG, JUDAS E. RECENDEZ, JUDY COLLADO, JUSTIN A. WALDECK, K.K., KAIYA COLLADO, KARA CONNELLY, KARAR A. ALABSAWI, KARON MIXSON, KATHLEEN PIRTLE, KATHLEEN STEPHENS, KATHY KUGLER, KEITH VEVERKA, KELLY GILLIS, KELLY VON LETKEMANN, KENDALL LYNNE RASMUSSON, KEVIN CONNELLY, KIMBERLY MILLER, KRISTEN KELLEY, KURTISS LAMB, L.S., LANI D. BOGART, LEASA DOLLAR, LESLIE KEY HARDCASTLE, LINDA REUBEN, LISA M. LAMB, LISA RAMACI, LUIS GARZA, LUIS ROSA-ALBERTY, LUIS ROSA-VALENTIN, M.R., MARICEL MURRAY, MARIO BOWEN, MARK DAMMANN, MARK E. THOMSEN, MARK MUNNS, MARTHA ELAINE JACKIE STEWART, MARTHA LOONEY, MARY NEIBERGER, MASINA TULIAU, MATTHEW L. MERGELE, MAXIMILLIAN SHROYER, MELINDA FLICK, MELISSA DOHENY, MICHAEL CHAND, JR., MICHAEL COOK, MICHAEL LUKOW, MICHAEL MURPHY-SWEET, MICHAEL WEATHERLY, MICHELE WHITE, MICHELLE TAYLOR, MICHELLE WEST, NANCY COT, NOEL CONTRERAS, NOEL FARLEY, SR., NOEL S. FARLEY, NORMA CONTRERAS, PATRICK KEITH HANLEY, PATRICK REUBEN, PATRICK TUTWILER, PHYLLIS K. TAYLOR, QUINTEN REUBEN, RACHELLE IDOL, RALPH THOMSEN, REBEKAH KIRBY, RHETT STEPHENS, RICHARD CASEY, RICHARD LANDECK, RICHARD NEIBERGER, RIKKI LUKOW, ROBERT J. KUHLMEIER, ROBERT KUGLER, ROBERT NEIBERGER, ROBERT W. KUHLMEIER, ROBIN DAVIDSON, RONALD VEVERKA, RYAN CHAND, RYAN HICKMAN, RYAN WILSON, SAMANTHA DUNFORD, SAMANTHA TUCKER, SANDRA RYAN, SANDRA SOLIDAY, SARA LILLY, SHARON DEBRABANDER, SHARON JOHNSTON, SHARONDA PARLIN, SHAWN RYAN, SHELLEY ANN CASEY, SHERRI C. HOILMAN, STEPHANIE JUNEAU, SUMMER STEPHENS, SUSAN ARNOLD, TAMMY DENBOER, TAMMY KINNEY, TANJA KUHLMEIER, TANYA EVRARD, TAUSOLO AIETI, TERESA BECKLEY, TERRI OVERTON, THERESA A. KUHLMEIER, THOMAS KUHLMEIER, TRENT STEPHENS, TYLER NORAGER, VALENCIA COOK, VICKIE MCHONE, VICTORIA LANDECK, VIRGINIA BILLITER, W. ANN MEULI, W. JEAN REEVES, WILLIAM JUSTIN WEATHERLY, Z.D.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparacino, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R. Sparacino on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sparacino, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9130118) filed by TAUSOLO AIETI, KEITH VEVERKA, JOHN KIRBY, SHAWN RYAN, LANI D. BOGART, JOYCE CRAIG, DEREK STEPHENS, JAMES VAUGHN, K.K., CRYSTAL TUTWILER, SHARON JOHNSTON, JOHN K. TAYLOR, NANCY COT, JUDY COLLADO, DIANA THOMAS, VICKIE MCHONE, JIMMY CONNOLLY, CHARLES B. GREGSTON, MAXIMILLIAN SHROYER, LEASA DOLLAR, E.R., D.W., THERESA A. KUHLMEIER, KENDALL LYNNE RASMUSSON, JENNIE MORIN, J.D., CAMERON FARLEY, MARICEL MURRAY, EMMA MCGARRY, JOHN MIXSON, AMY RITCHIE, RONALD VEVERKA, JONATHAN CONTRERAS, SR., JENNIFER LINK, LUIS ROSA-ALBERTY, TERESA BECKLEY, ELIZABETH MURPHY-SWEET, ROBIN DAVIDSON, W. JEAN REEVES, QUINTEN REUBEN, JUSTIN A. WALDECK, GRANT VON LETKEMANN II, VIRGINIA BILLITER, ROBERT NEIBERGER, RACHELLE IDOL, JAMI LIN WILSON, MARK MUNNS, DONNA FARLEY, J.M., ILIANA ROSA-VALENTIN, E.H., CARRIE THOMPSON, AMI NEIBERGER, CRISTA MUNNS, TRENT STEPHENS, A.R., DAVID THOMAS, BILLY RYAN, CASEY NICOLE REUBEN, JOHN ROBERT YOUNG, ERIC BILLITER, JANET L. RIOS, COLLEEN CZAPLICKI, KELLY VON LETKEMANN, BRIAN J. CASEY, ERIN BOUTEN, TANJA KUHLMEIER, MICHAEL CHAND, JR., PATRICK KEITH HANLEY, Z.D., A.T., JOSEPH MIXSON, BARBARA FARLEY, DAVID C. IVERSON, LUIS GARZA, ELENA SHAW, CLIFFORD VAUGHN, RYAN HICKMAN, MICHELLE WEST, MARY NEIBERGER, DENNIS DEBRABANDER, BRANDEAUX CAMPBELL, MELISSA DOHENY, CARL REIHER, MICHELE WHITE, JAMES GMACHOWSKI, MICHAEL LUKOW, JOHN KUHLMEIER, DAISY TUCKER, EDWARD HANLEY, BRITTANY HOGAN, SAMANTHA TUCKER, SUMMER STEPHENS, PATRICK TUTWILER, DANIEL PRICE, KRISTEN KELLEY, NOEL S. FARLEY, RICHARD LANDECK, ANDRE BROWN, MARK E. THOMSEN, LESLIE KEY HARDCASTLE, THOMAS KUHLMEIER, EUGENE DELOZIER, MATTHEW L. MERGELE, SHERRI C. HOILMAN, JEAN DAMMANN, JONI REEVES, TANYA EVRARD, BRIAN G. TAYLOR, MASINA TULIAU, M.R., JEREMY D. SMITH, KATHLEEN PIRTLE, CARLOS CONTRERAS, PHYLLIS K. TAYLOR, AUNDRA CRAIG, WILLIAM JUSTIN WEATHERLY, BRENDA CHAND, C.S., DOUGLAS VEVERKA, BEN REUBEN, ISABELL VINCENT, VICTORIA LANDECK, ROBERT W. KUHLMEIER, NOEL FARLEY, SR., FRANCES ROBINSON, JONATHAN CRAIG, RIKKI LUKOW, ERIN DRUCTOR, SANDRA RYAN, BRUCE LUKOW, JOSE OLGUIN, KEVIN CONNELLY, BARB THIEDE, ANDREW LUKOW, BREE REUBEN, DANIELLE PACKER, JESSICA FARLEY, DENISE JACKSON, MICHAEL MURPHY-SWEET, RHETT STEPHENS, JEANNINE VAUGHN, CHRIS FARLEY, SHARONDA PARLIN, RYAN WILSON, W. ANN MEULI, DANA SVENSON, BRANDON ARNOLD, RICHARD CASEY, LUIS ROSA-VALENTIN, REBEKAH KIRBY, STEPHANIE JUNEAU, TYLER NORAGER, CHRISTOPHER PACKER, KELLY GILLIS, ROBERT KUGLER, ANGIE RYAN, RALPH THOMSEN, DANIEL DUDEK, KARON MIXSON, DEBRA L. COOK-RUSSELL, SUSAN ARNOLD, J.D.J.T., HERNAN CONTRERAS, PATRICK REUBEN, ALEX ROSA-VALENTIN, JARED S. STEVENS, DANNYEL CONTRERAS, JESSICA REW, LISA M. LAMB, KATHY KUGLER, SAMANTHA DUNFORD, LINDA REUBEN, KARAR A. ALABSAWI, BRETT FARLEY, ROBERT J. KUHLMEIER, FRANCIS L. COT, KARA CONNELLY, JOHNNY WAYMAN ALEXANDER, SHARON DEBRABANDER, KIMBERLY MILLER, SALLY CHAND, BRIDGET JUNEAU, MELINDA FLICK, ERIC NEIBERGER, JOHNNY CASTILLO, SHELLEY ANN CASEY, MARIO BOWEN, CAROL POLLEY, KATHLEEN STEPHENS, DAVID ARNOLD, CHRISTOPHER BOUTEN, DAVID KUHLMEIER, MICHAEL COOK, KAIYA COLLADO, RICHARD NEIBERGER, NOEL CONTRERAS, DANIEL THOMAS, SR., JAMES REEVES, JASON RYAN, JASON ROBINSON, MARTHA ELAINE JACKIE STEWART, ANTHONY FARINA, BILLY JOHNSON, ALICIA MIXSON, TAMMY KINNEY, J.R., CHRISTOPHER COT, ADAM MAGERS, MARK DAMMANN, VALENCIA COOK, MARTHA LOONEY, MICHELLE TAYLOR, EDWARD KUHLMEIER, EVAN D. BOGART, JARED REEVES, JUDAS E. RECENDEZ, DAVID WOODARD, SARA LILLY, DAVID FARLEY, BRITTANI HOBSON, LISA RAMACI, DANIEL THOMAS, JR., NORMA CONTRERAS, CHRISTINA MAHON, ANTHONY M. GERBER, JOSEPH PAUL LUKOW, ARDELL THOMSEN, ANONA GONELLI, TAMMY DENBOER, KURTISS LAMB, JOSHUA P.G. WOLD, CYNTHIA PARLIN, CESAR CONTRERAS, RYAN CHAND, SANDRA SOLIDAY, TERRI OVERTON, ANITA BAKER, EMILY SHAW, MICHAEL WEATHERLY, L.S., JOHN DAGGETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Sparacino, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.K. is a litigant

Latest cases where EH, LLC d/b/a Honda of Frontenac is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A. Eisman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy P. Harkness Esq.