This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:33:08 (UTC).

Jasmine Chamu v. ADESA California, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 Jasmine Chamu filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ADESA California, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rozella A. Oliver and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08533

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasmine Chamu

Defendants

KAR Auction Services, Inc.

ADESA California, LLC

Does 1 through 100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Nourmand

James Alexander De Sario

Melissa Misao Kurata

Defendant Attorneys

Vartan Serge Madoyan

Margaret Rosenthal

Joseph S Persoff

Nicholas D Poper

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

10 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#12

#14

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants ADESA California, LLC, KAR Auction Services, Inc..(Rosenthal, Margaret) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Notice of Electronic Filing re Order to Show Cause #12 e-mailed to Melissa Kurata bounced due to No longer at firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/14/2021. (wm) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT IN LIGHT OF PENDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Defendants deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is now December 10, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 10, 2020 filed by Defendants ADESA California, LLC, KAR Auction Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madoyan, Vartan) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:19-cv-01183 PSG(RAOx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim and Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08533 PSG(RAOx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (rn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020

DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants ADESA California, LLC, Does 1 through 100, Inclusive, KAR Auction Services, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Jasmine Chamu. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendants KAR Auction Services, Inc., ADESA California, LLC.(Rosenthal, Margaret) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants ADESA California, LLC, KAR Auction Services, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants ADESA California, LLC, KAR Auction Services, Inc., identifying ADESA, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Margaret) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV28957 Receipt No: BCACDC-28130385 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants KAR Auction Services, Inc., ADESA California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Attorney Margaret Rosenthal added to party ADESA California, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Margaret Rosenthal added to party KAR Auction Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rosenthal, Margaret) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less