This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2023 at 08:16:36 (UTC).

Champion v. Hodges et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 Champion filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hodges. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00974

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caitanya A Champion

Edmond, OK 73012

Defendants

FNU Hodges

Wade Gourley

FNU LNU

Oklahoma City Police Department

FNU Townsend

Tommie Johnson, III

Oklahoma County Sheriff Department

Michael Parsons

Allied Universal

Quail Springs Mall

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Caitanya A Champion. (ekw) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#3

(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Caitanya A Champion referred to Shon Erwin. Signed by direction of Judge David L. Russell on 11/10/2022. (ekw) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER -- The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs ECF No. #2 . However, the Application is deficient. Plaintiff must now supplement his application and provide complete and detailed financial information about his income and all his monthly expenses. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by submitting an amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on or before December 2, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 11/16/2022. (mc) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Court's orders. This report and recommendation terminates the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge unless and until the matter is re-referred. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 12/16/2022. (mc) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Court's orders. This report and recommendation terminates the referral to the undersigned magistrate judge unless and until the matter is re-referred. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 12/16/2022. (mc) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER -- The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs ECF No. #2 . However, the Application is deficient. Plaintiff must now supplement his application and provide complete and detailed financial information about his income and all his monthly expenses. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by submitting an amended Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on or before December 2, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 11/16/2022. (mc) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Caitanya A Champion referred to Shon Erwin. Signed by direction of Judge David L. Russell on 11/10/2022. (ekw) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Caitanya A Champion. (ekw) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allied Universal, Wade Gourley, FNU Hodges, Tommie Johnson, III, FNU LNU, Oklahoma City Police Department, Oklahoma County Sheriff Department, Michael Parsons, Quail Springs Mall, FNU Townsend filed by Caitanya A Champion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less