This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2020 at 05:27:03 (UTC).

Champagne v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Champagne filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-46127

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt PLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cephalon Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Walgreen Co.

Cardinal Health Inc.

CVS Health Corporation

Rite-Aid Corporation

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Michael G. Stag

Attorney at Stag Liuzza

365 Canal Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

John Bartholomew Kelly, III

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Kurt Offner

Attorney at Ste. 1625

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Dominick F. Impastato, III

Attorney at Frischhertz, Poulliard, Frischhertz & Impastato

1130 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ashley M. Liuzza

Attorney at Stag Liuzza

365 Canal Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Anthony D. Irpino

Attorney at Irpino Avin Hawkins

2216 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Matthew Douglas Rogenes

Attorney at Stag Liuzza

365 Canal Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeanne K. Demarest

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly, & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70131

Roderick Alvendia

Attorney at Alvendia, Kelly, & Demarest, LLC

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70131

Pearl A. Robertson

Attorney at Irpino Avin Hawkins

2216 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO)(SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Attachment

1 #5

Attachment

#4

(#4) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (SWE) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/6/2019) (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #23

Attachment

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00797. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2033778.), filed by St. Charles Parish Sheriff. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment, #12 Attachment, #13 Attachment, #14 Attachment, #15 Attachment, #16 Attachment, #17 Attachment, #18 Attachment, #19 Attachment, #20 Attachment, #21 Attachment, #22 Attachment, #23 Attachment, #24 Attachment, #25 Attachment, #26 Attachment, #27 Attachment, #28 Attachment)(Alvendia, Roderick) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #25

Attachment

1 #24

Attachment

6 #1

Certified CTO

5 #1

Minute Order

1 #22

Attachment

1 #1

Attachment

1 #2

Attachment

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2019)

1 #4

Attachment

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00797. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO)(SWE) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (SWE) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/6/2019) (SWE). [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#3) Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Morris & Dickson Co., LLC and Louisiana Wholesale Drug Co.. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2033778.), filed by St. Charles Parish Sheriff. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment, #12 Attachment, #13 Attachment, #14 Attachment, #15 Attachment, #16 Attachment, #17 Attachment, #18 Attachment, #19 Attachment, #20 Attachment, #21 Attachment, #22 Attachment, #23 Attachment, #24 Attachment, #25 Attachment, #26 Attachment, #27 Attachment, #28 Attachment)(Alvendia, Roderick) [Transferred from lamd on 12/11/2019.] (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.