This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 09:54:06 (UTC).

Chambless Enterprises L L C et al v. Redfield et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Chambless Enterprises L L C filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Redfield. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01455

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chambless Enterprises L L C

Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc

Defendants

Centers for Disease Control & Prevention

Nina Witkofsky

Dept of Health & Human Services

Robert Redfield

William Pelham Barr

Alex M Azar, Jr

Amicus Curiae

National Medical Association

Danya E Kenne

Emily A Benfer

Childrens Healthwatch

Matthew Desmond

National Hispanic Medical Association

Michael Z Levy

George Consortium

Gregg Gonsalves

Kathryn M Leifheit

David Vlahov

American Medical Association

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James C Rather, Jr

Attorney at Alker & Rather

4030 Lonesome Rd Ste B

Mandeville, LA 70448

Luke Anthony Wake

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

930 G St

Sacramento, CA 95814

Steven M Simpson

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation (VA)

3100 Carendon Blvd Ste 610

Arlington, VA 22201

Ethan W Blevins

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

930 G St

Sacramento, CA 95814

Hannah S Marcley

Attorney at Pacific Legal Foundation

930 G St

Sacramento, CA 95814

Defendant Attorneys

Leslie Cooper Vigen

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice (L St/11508)

1100 L St N W Ste 11508

Washington, DC 20005

Steven A Myers

Attorney at U S Dept of Justice (L St/11508)

1100 L St N W Ste 11508

Washington, DC 20005

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

William P Quigley

Attorney at Loyola University School of Law

7214 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70118

Davida Finger

Attorney at Loyola University School of Law

7214 St Charles Ave

New Orleans, LA 70118

Other Attorneys

Walter P McClatchey, Jr

Attorney at Legal Svcs of LA (ALEX)

P O Box 350

Alexandria, LA 71309

David H Williams

Attorney at Southeast LA Legal Srvs (NO)

1010 Common St Ste 1400A

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

40 #1

Proposed order

#40

39 #15

Exhibit

39 #10

Affidavit

39 #9

Exhibit

39 #6

Affidavit

39 #5

Exhibit

39 #2

Affidavit

39 #1

Exhibit

1 #8

Chambless Corporate Disclosure

1 #7

Summons to Witkofsky

1 #6

Summons to Redfield

1 #5

Summons to HHS

1 #4

Summons to CDC

1 #3

Summons to Barr

1 #2

Summons to Azar

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Myers, Steven) Modified on 1/8/2021 to modify docket text (Miletello, A). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Returned Executed by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc and Chambless Enterprises L L C Alex M Azar, Jr served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; William Pelham Barr served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Centers for Disease Control & Prevention served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Dept of Health & Human Services served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Nina Witkofsky served on 11/20/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event which calculates appropriate answer due date. See pdf document filed as #39 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint , filed by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Affidavit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Affidavit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Affidavit, #15 Exhibit)(aty,Rather, James) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C Declaration of Service (aty,Rather, James) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE by Alex M Azar, Jr, William Pelham Barr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Dept of Health & Human Services, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky of Congressional Action (aty,Vigen, Leslie) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER denying #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/22/2020. (crt,Keifer, K) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) RULING re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chambless Enterprises L L C, Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/22/2020. (crt,Keifer, K) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/15/2020. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #32 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply in Support of Pltfs Motion for Prelim Injunction. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for HANNAH MARCLEY to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4467364) by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for STEVEN SIMPSON to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4467363) by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for LUKE WAKE to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4467361) by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ENTRY: re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chambless Enterprises L L C, Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc. A telephone Status Conference is set for 11/18/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Terry A Doughty. Call-in information will be provided by email. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/13/2020. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declarations of Joshua Chambless and Tammy Esponge, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Rather, James) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. (aty,Rather, James) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky, Dept of Health & Human Services, William Pelham Barr, Alex M Azar Jr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to James C Rather, Jr on behalf of Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/27/2020. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert Redfield, Nina Witkofsky, Dept of Health & Human Services, William Pelham Barr, Alex M Azar, Jr, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention (Filing fee $400, receipt number BLAWDC-4465424) filed by Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc, Chambless Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons to Azar, #3 Summons to Barr, #4 Summons to CDC, #5 Summons to HHS, #6 Summons to Redfield, #7 Summons to Witkofsky, #8 Chambless Corporate Disclosure)(Attorney James C Rather, Jr added to party Apartment Association of Louisiana Inc.(pty:pet), Attorney James C Rather, Jr added to party Chambless Enterprises L L C(pty:pet))(aty,Rather, James) Modified to edit docket text on 11/12/2020 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Medical Association is a litigant

Latest cases where National Hispanic Medical Association is a litigant

Latest cases where American Medical Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Health and Human Services, Division Children Family Services, also known as D.H.H.S. is a litigant