This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:52:54 (UTC).

Chambers v. ("The B.O.P.") United States Penitentiary Lewisburg

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Chambers filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against The B O P United States Penitentiary Lewisburg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sylvia H. Rambo and EB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02067

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sylvia H. Rambo

Referral Judge

EB

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Demarcus L. Chambers

Thomson, IL 61285

Respondent

David J Ebbert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

2241 AUSA - Memphis

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Memphis

167 N. Main St., Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38103

R D Euliss

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, Middle District of Pennsylvania

228 Walnut Street, Suite 220

Harrisburg, PA 17108

Joseph Terz

Attorney at US Attorney's Office, MDPA - Prisoner

228 Walnut Street. Suite 220, Po Box 11754

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1754

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER denying petr's mtn for exttm to file a traverse #17 .Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/21/20. (ma) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged with Motion for IFP), filed by Demarcus L. Chambers.(mfa) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

16 #1

Unpublished Opinion(s)

#16

(#16) Supplement by David J Ebbert. to #11 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus . (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Euliss, R) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that 1)Respondent is DIRECTED to file a supplemental response addressing Petitioner's First Step Act claim within 14 days. 2)Petnrs #14 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED to the extent that Petitioner directed to file his traverse within thirty (30) days of the date on which Respondent files his supplemental response. Petitioners motion (Doc. No. 14) is DENIEDWITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent he requests the appointment of counsel. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/14/2020. (sc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to reply to US Attorney's Responsefiled by Demarcus L. Chambers.(mfa) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Demarcus L. Chambers (mfa) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David J Ebbert re #11 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus (Euliss, R) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

11 #2

Unpublished Opinion(s)

11 #1

Exhibit(s)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by David J Ebbert by David J Ebbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Euliss, R) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#10

(#10) Letter from Demarcus Chambers that he is moving. New address to follow. (mfa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Attorney Joseph Terz for David J Ebbert added. Show Cause Response due by 12/26/2019.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/5/19. (ma) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #4

Judicial Cards

1 #3

Envelope (Front and Back)

1 #2

Memorandum

1 #1

Supporting Documents

#1

(#1) PRO SE Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Demarcus L. Chambers against ("The B.O.P.") United States Penitentiary Lewisburg. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Memorandum, #3 Envelope (Front and Back), #4 Judicial Cards)(csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER denying petr's mtn for exttm to file a traverse #17 .Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/21/20. (ma) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged with Motion for IFP), filed by Demarcus L. Chambers.(mfa) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Supplement by David J Ebbert. to #11 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus . (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Euliss, R) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that 1)Respondent is DIRECTED to file a supplemental response addressing Petitioner's First Step Act claim within 14 days. 2)Petnrs #14 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED to the extent that Petitioner directed to file his traverse within thirty (30) days of the date on which Respondent files his supplemental response. Petitioners motion (Doc. No. 14) is DENIEDWITHOUT PREJUDICE to the extent he requests the appointment of counsel. Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 1/14/2020. (sc) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to reply to US Attorney's Responsefiled by Demarcus L. Chambers.(mfa) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Demarcus L. Chambers (mfa) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David J Ebbert re #11 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus (Euliss, R) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by David J Ebbert by David J Ebbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Euliss, R) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Demarcus Chambers that he is moving. New address to follow. (mfa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed upon the USA office Hbg as to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 and Order to show cause #8 . (ma) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, Attorney Joseph Terz for David J Ebbert added. Show Cause Response due by 12/26/2019.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 12/5/19. (ma) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (mfa) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred electronically in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-02819 containing electronic documents. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET AND TRANSFERRING PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/3/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/2/19. (Lipman, Sheryl) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demarcus L. Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Fund Statement)(csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Demarcus L. Chambers against ("The B.O.P.") United States Penitentiary Lewisburg. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Memorandum, #3 Envelope (Front and Back), #4 Judicial Cards)(csf) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less