This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:49:13 (UTC).

Chambers v. Schiff Realty, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Chambers filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Schiff Realty, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00511

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.

Defendant

Schiff Realty, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shawn Alex Heller

Attorney at Social Justice Law Collective, PL (Dunedin)

974 Howard Ave

Dunedin, FL 34698-4923

Joshua Aaron Glickman

Attorney at Social Justice Law Collective, PL (Dunedin)

974 Howard Ave

Dunedin, FL 34698-4923

Defendant Attorney

Robson David Charles Powers

Attorney at Burandt Adamski Feichthaler & Sanchez PLLC

1714 Cape Coral Pkwy E

Cape Coral, FL 33904-9620

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDERED: Plaintiff Delroy Chambers' Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and Request That the Court Vacate Its Order and Opinion (Doc. #10) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/4/2020. (AEH) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDERED: Defendant Schiff Realty, Inc's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #6) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.'s Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Chambers may file an amended complaint on or before September 17, 2020. Otherwise, the Court will close this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/31/2020. (AEH) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Powers, Robson) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. Related case(s): no (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#12

(#12) PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically FOR EXTENSION OF TIME NUNC PRO TUNC TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, AND REQUEST THAT THE COURT VACATE ITS ORDER AND OPINION (DOC. 8) by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Heller, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 09/02/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit 1 - Related License Information for Carlos Florez

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Schiff Realty, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Related License Information for Carlos Florez)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Powers, Robson) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#5

(#5) RETURN of service executed on 7/22/2020 by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr as to Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#4

(#4) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/17/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Schiff Realty, Inc. (drn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Schiff Realty, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17070397) filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Powers, Robson) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. Related case(s): no (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDERED: Plaintiff Delroy Chambers' Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and Request That the Court Vacate Its Order and Opinion (Doc. #10) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/4/2020. (AEH) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically FOR EXTENSION OF TIME NUNC PRO TUNC TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, AND REQUEST THAT THE COURT VACATE ITS ORDER AND OPINION (DOC. 8) by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Heller, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Schiff Realty, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Related License Information for Carlos Florez)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDERED: Defendant Schiff Realty, Inc's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #6) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Delroy A. Chambers, Jr.'s Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Chambers may file an amended complaint on or before September 17, 2020. Otherwise, the Court will close this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/31/2020. (AEH) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 10/5/2020. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Powers, Robson) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of service executed on 7/22/2020 by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr as to Schiff Realty, Inc.. (Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/17/2020. (jmc) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Schiff Realty, Inc. (drn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-511-FtM-38MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Schiff Realty, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17070397) filed by Delroy A. Chambers, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Heller, Shawn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less