This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:07:00 (UTC).

Chambers v. Mountain Productions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Chambers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mountain Productions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01263

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Chambers

Defendants

Mountain Productions, Inc.

Mountain Productions Real Estate, Inc.

Mountain Production Services, Inc.

C3 Presents, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dina Maria Ninfo

Attorney at Angelini & Ori, LLC

155 North Michigan Avenue, Suie 400

Chicago, IL 60601

Nicole Schroeder

Attorney at Angelini & Ori Llc

155 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

John P. Lynch, Jr.

Attorney at Cremer, Spina, Shaughnessy, Jansen & Siegert, LLC

One North Franklin, 10Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

William P Bingle

Attorney at Cremer, Spina, Shaughnessy, Jansen & Siegert Llc

One North Franklin, 10Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Rule 16 conference held on 4/19/2019. All non-expert discovery to be commenced in time to be complete by 12/2/2019. Reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) due from Plaintiff by 1/20/2020, with expert(s) to be deposed by 2/20/2020. From Defendant by 3/20/2020, with expert(s) to be deposed by 4/20/2020. Dispositive motions to be filed by 5/20/2020. Plaintiff to prepare proposed pretrial order draft by 7/10/2020, Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2020. Status hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On the court's own motion, Rule 16 conference set for 4/16/2019 is stricken and re-set to 4/19/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#13

(#13) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Christopher Chambers. (Schroeder, Nicole) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Chambers by Nicole Schroeder (Schroeder, Nicole) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Agreed motion to extend the time for the parties' Rule 26(f) report of planning meeting and continue the initial pretrial conference #9 is granted without an appearance. Parties are granted an extension of time to 4/9/2019 to conduct a Fed. R. Civ., P. 26(f) meeting and to complete a planning report. Rule 16 conference set for 3/14/2019 is stricken and re-set to 4/16/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) Modified on 3/13/2019 (etv, ). (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION by Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc. for extension of time Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc.'s Agreed Motion to Extend the Time for the Parties' Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting and Continue the Initial Pretrial Conference (Bingle, William) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#10

(#10) Notice of Agreed Motion of Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc.'s Agreed Motion to Extend the Time for the Parties' Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting and Continue the Initial Pretrial Conference NOTICE of Motion by William P Bingle for presentment of extension of time, #9 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/14/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Bingle, William) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 3/21/2019 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 16. on 3/14/2019 at 9:00 AM. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) Defendant Mountain Productions Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint at Law ANSWER to Complaint by Mountain Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing of Defendant Mountain Productions Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint at Law)(Bingle, William) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

7 #1

Notice of Filing Notice of Filing of Defendant Mountain Productions Inc.'s

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc. by William P Bingle (Bingle, William) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 3/21/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#4

(#4) EMAILED notice of removal letter to Dina Maria Ninfo (las, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc. by John P. Lynch, Jr (Lynch, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lynch, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County IL-Law Division, case number (2018L-3794) filed by Mountain Productions, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15504415. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc.'s Notice and Petition of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Lynch, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Notice of Filing of Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc.'s Notice and Petit

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Rule 16 conference held on 4/19/2019. All non-expert discovery to be commenced in time to be complete by 12/2/2019. Reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) due from Plaintiff by 1/20/2020, with expert(s) to be deposed by 2/20/2020. From Defendant by 3/20/2020, with expert(s) to be deposed by 4/20/2020. Dispositive motions to be filed by 5/20/2020. Plaintiff to prepare proposed pretrial order draft by 7/10/2020, Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2020. Status hearing set for 7/30/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: On the court's own motion, Rule 16 conference set for 4/16/2019 is stricken and re-set to 4/19/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Christopher Chambers. (Schroeder, Nicole) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christopher Chambers by Nicole Schroeder (Schroeder, Nicole) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Agreed motion to extend the time for the parties' Rule 26(f) report of planning meeting and continue the initial pretrial conference #9 is granted without an appearance. Parties are granted an extension of time to 4/9/2019 to conduct a Fed. R. Civ., P. 26(f) meeting and to complete a planning report. Rule 16 conference set for 3/14/2019 is stricken and re-set to 4/16/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) Modified on 3/13/2019 (etv, ). (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Agreed Motion of Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc.'s Agreed Motion to Extend the Time for the Parties' Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting and Continue the Initial Pretrial Conference NOTICE of Motion by William P Bingle for presentment of extension of time, #9 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/14/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Bingle, William) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc. for extension of time Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc.'s Agreed Motion to Extend the Time for the Parties' Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting and Continue the Initial Pretrial Conference (Bingle, William) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 3/21/2019 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 16. on 3/14/2019 at 9:00 AM. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant Mountain Productions Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint at Law ANSWER to Complaint by Mountain Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing of Defendant Mountain Productions Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint at Law)(Bingle, William) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc. by William P Bingle (Bingle, William) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 3/21/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EMAILED notice of removal letter to Dina Maria Ninfo (las, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc. by John P. Lynch, Jr (Lynch, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lynch, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County IL-Law Division, case number (2018L-3794) filed by Mountain Productions, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15504415. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Defendant Mountain Productions, Inc.'s Notice and Petition of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Lynch, John) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.