This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2020 at 08:04:09 (UTC).

Chambers v. Erskine et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Chambers filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Erskine. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00408

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roscoe Chambers

Thomson, IL 61285

Defendants

Mayberry

Erslhine

Muella

Erskine

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Roscoe Chambers. (kjw) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#2

(#2) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER dismissing case without prejudice to refiling in proper jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 12/18/2019. (r) Paper copy of order mailed this date to Roscoe Chambers #13495-030 THOMSON AUSP U.S. PENITENTIARY, SATELLITE CAMP P.O. Box 1002 Thomson, IL 61285 (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Erslhine, Mayberry, Muella, filed by Roscoe Chambers. (kjw) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Roscoe Chambers. (kjw) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (slg) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL REVIEW ORDER dismissing case without prejudice to refiling in proper jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 12/18/2019. (r) Paper copy of order mailed this date to Roscoe Chambers #13495-030 THOMSON AUSP U.S. PENITENTIARY, SATELLITE CAMP P.O. Box 1002 Thomson, IL 61285 (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Erslhine, Mayberry, Muella, filed by Roscoe Chambers. (kjw) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Erskine is a litigant

Latest cases where Mayberry is a litigant