This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2021 at 07:09:35 (UTC).

Chaidez v. Santa Rita Jail et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Chaidez filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Santa Rita Jail. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins, Richard Seeborg and PSLC MWD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04240

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

PSLC MWD

Presiding Judges

Nathanael M. Cousins

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Jesus Chaidez

Dublin, CA 94568

Defendants

Dr. Maria Magat

Santa Rita Jail

Well Path Medical Staff

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case,. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/2/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan Jesus Chaidez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Juan Jesus Chaidez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail on 6/3/2021 to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/3/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/12/2021. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail on 6/3/2021 to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/3/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#2

(#2) BLANK MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan Jesus Chaidez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Maria Magat, Santa Rita Jail, Well Path Medical Staff. Filed by Juan Jesus Chaidez. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case,. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/2/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan Jesus Chaidez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Juan Jesus Chaidez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail on 6/3/2021 to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/3/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/12/2021. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail on 6/3/2021 to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/3/2021 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BLANK MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan Jesus Chaidez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Maria Magat, Santa Rita Jail, Well Path Medical Staff. Filed by Juan Jesus Chaidez. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Well Path Medical is a litigant