This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2021 at 07:58:02 (UTC).

Chahta v. Bureau of Indian Affairs et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Chahta filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bureau of Indian Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Dugan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01158

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Dugan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Breeze Chahta

Madison, IL 62060

Defendants

Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma

Bureau of Indian Affairs

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Proceed and for Expedited Proceedings by Breeze Chahta. (kls3) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (tjk) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE: Breeze Chahta. was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Breeze Chahta. shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 12/1/2020 (kdw) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned in error to Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly at case opening. Case Reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan. Unless the newly assigned judge directs otherwise, all deadlines and hearing dates shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 20-1158-DWD.(dkd) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Breeze Chahta. (amv) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Breeze Chahta. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1158-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 11/23/2020 (amv) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bureau of Indian Affairs, Choctaw Nation of Oklahoma, filed by Breeze Chahta.(amv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kls3). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHOCTAW NATION OF OKLAHOMA is a litigant