This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:29:39 (UTC).

Chaffins v. SSA

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Chaffins filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SSA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph M. Hood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Anthony Chaffins

Defendant

Commissioner of SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henry David Hicks

Attorney at The Hicks Law Firm, PLLC

Po Box 277

Stanville, KY 41659

Defendant Attorney

Cheryl D. Morgan

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, EDKY

260 W. Vine Street, Suite 300

Lexington, KY 40507-1612

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 is GRANTED. The tendered Complaint #1 shall be made a permanent part of the record herein. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/18/2020. (RCB)cc: COR (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) GENERAL ORDER 20-17 re: Filing of Answers and Administrative Transcripts in Social Security Benefit Cases: 1. For cases challenging Final decisions of Commission of Social Security involving denial of benefits, the time for filing an Answer and administrative transcript is extended to 120 days following service of process. 2. This Order applies to pending cases in which Answers have not been filed and future cases through April 1, 2021. 3. Extensions given by this Order expire 4/1/2021. Expiration of Order does not prohibit Commissioner from seeking additional extensions in individual cases. Signed by Chief Judge Danny C. Reeves on September 25, 2020. cc: COR, USA (SKV) (Entered: 09/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Anthony Chaffins via FedEx by USM to Commissioner of SSA served on 8/20/2020. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via FedEx by USM on 8/21/2020; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via FedEx by USM on 8/20/2020. (RCB) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (RCB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Receipt) (RCB). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 is GRANTED. The tendered Complaint #1 shall be made a permanent part of the record herein. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/18/2020. (RCB)cc: COR (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Howard Anthony Chaffins (RCB) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (RCB) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Howard Anthony Chaffins (RCB) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Howard Anthony Chaffins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons SSA, #2 Proposed Summons USA, #3 Proposed Summons AG, #4 USM-285 SSA, #5 USM-285 USA, #6 USM-285 AG)(RCB) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less