This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:08:17 (UTC).

Chaffin v. Roberson

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Chaffin filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Roberson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01280

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Darnel Chaffin

Respondent

Kess Roberson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Stephen L. Richards

53 West Jackson Suite 756, Suite 205, Chicago

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry Status hearing set for 4/30/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Darnel Chaffin against Darnel Chaffin (against Kess Roberson) Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0752-15508063. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tedmund Gordon)(Richards, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Tedmund Gordon

#4

(#4) PDF no legible/blank CIVIL Cover Sheet (Richards, Stephen) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 2/27/2019 (bg, ). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Darnel Chaffin by Stephen L. Richards (Richards, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) PDF no legible/blank CIVIL Cover Sheet (Richards, Stephen) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 2/21/2019 (bg, ). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE entry Status hearing set for 4/30/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PDF no legible/blank CIVIL Cover Sheet (Richards, Stephen) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 2/27/2019 (bg, ). (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Darnel Chaffin by Stephen L. Richards (Richards, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PDF no legible/blank CIVIL Cover Sheet (Richards, Stephen) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 2/21/2019 (bg, ). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Darnel Chaffin against Darnel Chaffin (against Kess Roberson) Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0752-15508063. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tedmund Gordon)(Richards, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.