This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:42:31 (UTC).

Chaaban v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Chaaban filed an Other lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-MC-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Bahija Chaaban

Apopka, FL 32703

Defendant

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

In Re

Emergency Motion to Amend Certificate of Naturalization to Correct Date of Birth of Bahija Chaaban to January 2,1955

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Julie Posteraro

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM*

Suite 3100, 400 W Washington St

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Certificate of Naturalization toCorrect Date of Birth of Bahija Chaaban to January 2, 1955 (Doc. #1) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/3/2020. (JLC) Modified on 2/4/2020 (JLC). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion re #2 Order to show cause by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Posteraro, Julie) Modified on 2/4/2020 (BIA). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER to show cause why Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Certificate of Naturalization to Correct Date of Birth of Bahija Chaaban to January 2, 1955 (Doc. #1) should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/14/2020. (JLC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) Emergency MOTION to Amend Certificate of Naturalization to Correct Date of Birth of Bahija Chaaban to January 2,1955 by Bahija Chaaban. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BIA) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Certificate of Naturalization toCorrect Date of Birth of Bahija Chaaban to January 2, 1955 (Doc. #1) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 2/3/2020. (JLC) Modified on 2/4/2020 (JLC). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion re #2 Order to show cause by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Posteraro, Julie) Modified on 2/4/2020 (BIA). (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER to show cause why Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Certificate of Naturalization to Correct Date of Birth of Bahija Chaaban to January 2, 1955 (Doc. #1) should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/14/2020. (JLC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFEES paid by Bahija Chaaban (Filing fee $47.00 receipt number ORL-088177) (BIA) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Emergency MOTION to Amend Certificate of Naturalization to Correct Date of Birth of Bahija Chaaban to January 2,1955 by Bahija Chaaban. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BIA) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie Posteraro