This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2021 at 07:44:23 (UTC).

C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. v. Duse Export, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 C H Robinson Company, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Duse Export, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Micaela Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00302

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Micaela Alvarez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. doing business as Robinson Fresh

Defendants

Duse Export, LLC

3301 Kent Lane

Mcallen, TX 78503

Irma B. Duarte

Mcallen, TX 78503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark A Amendola

Attorney at Martyn and Associates Co. LPA

820 West Superior Ave, 10Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Proposed Order -Proposed Judgment

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #1

Summons

#6

#5

#4

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Agreed MOTION for Approval and Entry of Consent Judgment by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order -Proposed Judgment)(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re #16 Notice of Settlement. ( Status Report due by 11/5/2021, Initial Conference reset for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez, Show Cause Hearing reset for 11/16/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez)(Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Settlement by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., filed. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE TO #12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc.. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., filed.(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., filed. (Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re #11 Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Scheduling Conference (Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 10/1/2021. Initial Conference reset for 10/12/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez, Show Cause Hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez), (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Agreed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Scheduling Conference by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., filed.(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Irma B. Duarte served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Duse Export, LLC served on 8/17/2021, answer due 9/7/2021, filed.(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc., filed.(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Irma B. Duarte, Duse Export, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(klopez, 7) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc. identifying C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc. ("CHRW") as Corporate Parent, filed.(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez (by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Irma B. Duarte, filed.(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Duse Export, LLC, filed.(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Irma B. Duarte, Duse Export, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26865079) filed by C.H. Robinson Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Account, #2 Exhibit Unpaid Invoices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amendola, Mark) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CH Robinson Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Amendola