This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 07:46:32 (UTC).

Cetti v. Owens-Illinois, et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Cetti filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Owens-Illinois,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-60000

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMELIA CETTI

Cetti, Phillip, Estate of

Defendants

Inc. Owens-Illinois

OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY

KEENE CORPORATION

W.R. GRACE & COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT J. BRADLEY

Defendant Attorney

PETER J. RUBIN

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1253 in MDL Case 875 received from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. This case is transferred pursuant to Administrative Order No. 11, entered in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on August 15, 2006. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

2 #2

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

2 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a)(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT ANY RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FRCP 60(a) SHALL BE FILED BY 11/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT ANY RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FRCP 60(a) SHALL BE FILED BY 11/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a)(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:85-cv-04708. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1253 in MDL Case 875 received from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. This case is transferred pursuant to Administrative Order No. 11, entered in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on August 15, 2006. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/1996
  • DocketTerminated document [0-1] motion to dismiss , pursuant to Transfer Order. (vah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/28/1996)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/1994
  • DocketAssented to motion by W.R. Grace & Company to dismiss , filed. See Document #6874 in MML#1, MML#2, filed. Individual copies provided, and docketed in each case. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/26/1995)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/1992
  • DocketJudge Charles R. Weiner. Order of Dismissal entered in MDL-875 on 9/18/92. "...cases are dismissed without prejudice..." See Document #6805 in MML 1, MML 2. Copies sent to Liaison Counsel. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 09/15/1993)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/1991
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania, per July 29, 1991 transfer order of Multidistrict Litigation Panel in In Re: asbestos litigation (MDL-875). Case closed. (vah) Modified on 11/19/1991 [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 11/13/1991)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/1991
  • DocketMotion by Cetti, Phillip, Esta, Keene Corporation to dismiss Keene Corporation (SEE MML #1-5, #6684) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 08/03/1992)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/1991
  • DocketJudge Rya W. Zobel . Endorsed Order granting [0-1] motion to dismiss Owens Corning Fiberglas (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6650) (lmh) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 09/14/1992)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/1991
  • DocketMotion by Amelia Cetti, Owens Corning Fiberg to dismiss Owens Corning Fiberglas (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6650) (lmh) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 09/14/1992)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/1991
  • DocketMotion by Amelia Cetti, Cetti, Phillip, Esta, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Owens-Illinois Glass to dismiss Owens-Illinois, Inc. and Owens-Illinois Glass Co (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6683) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 07/29/1992)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less