This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 11:00:31 (UTC).

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's v. CSX Transportation, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against CSX Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Reona J. Daly and Stephen P. McGlynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00795

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Reona J. Daly

Stephen P. McGlynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's

Defendants

EVANSVILLE WESTERN RAILWAY, INC.

CSX Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joanna Maxwell

Attorney at Tressler LLP - Los Angeles

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew S. Chamberlin

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP -Greensboro

300 N. Greene Street, Suite 800

Greensboro, NC 27401

Scottie Forbes Lee

Attorney at Ellis & Winters, LLP

P.O. Box 2752

Greensboro, NC 27406

Robert S. Crowder

Attorney at Tressler LLP - Los Angeles

6100 Center Drive, Suite 1175

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant Attorneys

Henry Little Kitchin, Jr.

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

300 N 3Rd Street, Suite 320

Wilmington, NC 28401

Kathleen Klein Wubker

Attorney at Abel Bean Law

50 N. Laura Street, Suite 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32204

Andrew Joshua Steif

Attorney at Abel Bean Law P.A.

50 N. Laura Street, Suite 2500

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Mary Ellen Goode

Attorney at McGuireWoods

501 Fayetteville Street, Suite 500

Raleigh, NC 27601

Charles J. Swartwout

Attorney at Boyle Brasher LLC - Belleville

5000 West Main Street, Post Office Box 23560

Belleville, IL 62223-0560

Allison E. Lee

Attorney at Boyle Brasher LLC - St. Louis

1010 Market Street, Suite 950

St. Louis, MO 63101

Kathleen L. Wubker

Attorney at Abel Bean Law

100 N. Laura Street, Suite 501

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Andrew J. Steif

Attorney at Abel Bean Law

100 N. Laura Street, Suite 501

Jacksonville, FL 32225

 

Court Documents

#58

No Description Available

#48

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert S. Crowder for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/28/2019. (eef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#68

No Description Available

#62

No Description Available

#56

No Description Available

55 #7

Exhibit E

55 #5

Exhibit C

55 #1

Appendix of Exhibits

#40

No Description Available

36 #5

Exhibit Ex. 4 - 70 Fed. Reg. 52477

36 #2

Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Jay Smith

#31

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#79) ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Instructions to join the phone conference are as follows: Call toll free 1-888-684-8852, when prompted enter access code 6102338, when prompted enter the four-digit security code 9374. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 10/14/2020. (jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • Docket(#78) Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 277, this case is transferred from Judge J. Phil Gilbert and reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn. Unless the newly assigned judge directs otherwise, all deadlines and hearing dates shall remain in effect. All future pleadings shall bear the case number 20-795-SPM. (dkd) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER granting #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joanna Maxwell. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joanna Maxwell $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4291582 by on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Maxwell, Joanna) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) CJRA TRACK C assigned: The Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 2/2/2022 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert. Parties are to submit a Joint Report regarding Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order within 21 days of the entry of this filing. Scheduling/Discovery and Settlement Conferences will NOT be set for hearing unless requested by the parties or deemed necessary by the Court. (tag) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge J. Phil Gilbert for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-795-JPG. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Crowder, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew J. Steif. (rah)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew J. Steif $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4274788 by on behalf of CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Steif, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Swartwout, Charles) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert S. Crowder for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/28/2019. (eef) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Reissued Electronically as to Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.1.1. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joanna Maxwell Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3941279. by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert S. Crowder Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3941273. by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Chamberlin on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Chamberlin, Andrew) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Scottie Forbes Lee on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's (Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc., Evansville Western Railway, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3941208), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waybills)(Lee, Scottie) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less