This case was last updated from PACER on 03/25/2019 at 07:34:41 (UTC).

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London v. Panther Premium Logistics et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against Panther Premium Logistics. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen B. Molzen, Kirtan Khalsa and William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen B. Molzen

Presiding Judges

Kirtan Khalsa

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London

Defendants

Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.

Panther Premium Logistics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M Houliston

Attorney at The Law Offices of David M Houliston

7500 Jefferson Street Ne, Suite 106

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Defendant Attorneys

Tim L Fields

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk PA

P.O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103-2168

Nathan T Nieman

Attorney at Modrall, Sperling, Roehl, Harris, & Sisk, PA

Post Office Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Brenda M Saiz

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb, PA

201 Third Street Nw, Suite 2200, Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

#11

No Description Available

#8

(#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Houliston, David) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#1

Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6243227 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Panther Premium Logistics (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.'s and Defendant Panther Premium Logistics's answers and/or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint are due 2/19/2019. (am) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Panther Premium Logistics Initial Disclosure Statement and Documents (Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#13

(#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 3/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due 3/20/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/14/2019. (am) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#2

(#2) Transmittal of State Court Documents by Panther Premium Logistics (Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. of Consent to Removal (Nieman, Nathan) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Nieman, Nathan) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. Initial Disclosure Statement (Nieman, Nathan) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#12

No Description Available

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Houliston, David) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#6

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.'s and Defendant Panther Premium Logistics's answers and/or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint are due 2/19/2019. (am) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Notice of Certification for Conte Cicala (Houliston, David) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#17

(#17) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Panther Premium Logistics (Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Notice of Certification for Conte Cicala (Houliston, David) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Panther Premium Logistics Initial Disclosure Statement and Documents (Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. Initial Disclosure Statement (Nieman, Nathan) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Houliston, David) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Panther Premium Logistics (Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • (#16) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 4 and 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • (#15) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6331773 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cicala, Conte) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • (#14) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London by Conte C. Cicala (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Cicala, Conte)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 3/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due 3/20/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/14/2019. (am) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Nieman, Nathan) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London (Houliston, David) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.'s and Defendant Panther Premium Logistics's answers and/or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint are due 2/19/2019. (am) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respond to Complaint by Panther Premium Logistics, Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc.. (Nieman, Nathan) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Ryder Integrated Logistics, Inc. of Consent to Removal (Nieman, Nathan) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • (#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Transmittal of State Court Documents by Panther Premium Logistics (Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6243227 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Panther Premium Logistics (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Panther Premium Logistics Under 28 USCA 1337(a) and 49 USCA 14706(d)(3) from Fourth Judicial District Court, case number D-424-CV-2018-00092. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Panther Premium Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Saiz, Brenda) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.