This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2020 at 08:35:33 (UTC).

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269 v. M/V "MSC Gayane" et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269 filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against M/V MSC Gayane. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00845

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269 a/s/o Hortifrut Chile S.A.

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269

Defendants

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

M/V "MSC Gayane"

Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hanoch Sheps

Attorney at Mazzola Lindstrom LLP

1350 Avenue Of The Americas, 2Nd Fl.

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #7 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#14

(#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. for MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#13

(#13) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - ANSWER to #7 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) Modified on 3/20/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#12

(#12) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) Modified on 3/19/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service was accepted by Michael Morales, Claims Manager. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269..(Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc. served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service was accepted by Michael Morales, Claims Manager. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269..(Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/13/2020) (rro) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#8

(#8) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#7

(#13) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - ANSWER to #7 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) Modified on 3/20/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#6

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269 a/s/o Hortifrut Chile S.A.. (Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269 a/s/o Hortifrut Chile S.A.. (Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Hanoch Sheps to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by attorney of record; the PDF was not dated. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hanoch Sheps to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by attorney of record. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #7 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA) Inc. for MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Mark A. Beckman to RE-FILE Document #13 Answer to Complaint. ERROR(S): wrong case number indicated on document. (ldi) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Mark A. Beckman to RE-FILE Document #12 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). NOTE: The case number listed on the PDF is also incorrect. (ldi) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - ANSWER to #7 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) Modified on 3/20/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc...(Beckman, Mark) Modified on 3/19/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service was accepted by Michael Morales, Claims Manager. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269..(Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc. served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Service was accepted by Michael Morales, Claims Manager. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269..(Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/13/2020) (rro) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hanoch Sheps. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Hanoch Sheps to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by attorney of record; the PDF was not dated. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hanoch Sheps to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by attorney of record. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269 a/s/o Hortifrut Chile S.A.. (Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269 a/s/o Hortifrut Chile S.A.. (Sheps, Hanoch) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sheps, Hanoch) Modified on 2/3/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against M/V "MSC Gayane", MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Mediterranean Shipping Company (USA), Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18648207)Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number B090218M673133269 a/s/o Hortifrut Chile S.A...(Sheps, Hanoch) Modified on 2/3/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANOCH SHEPS