This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 07:12:10 (UTC).

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London et al v. ZJZ Hospitality, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ZJZ Hospitality, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew S Hanen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02345

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

General Security Idemnity Company of AZ

United Specialty Insurance Company

Respondent

ZJZ Hospitality, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Eridania Perez-Jaquez

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (Us) LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Jared Greisman

Attorney at Kennedys LLP

570 Lexington Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Respondent Attorney

Joseph Brantley Durrett, III

Attorney at Durrett Law Firm

1061 W. 17Th Street

Houston, TX 77008

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon( Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

31 #1

*Restricted*

31 #31

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#30

(#30) ORDER: granting #23 Motion to Transfer Case. For the reasons stated on the record during the hearing held on July 12, 2022, Respondent's motion to transfer venue, Dkt. No. 23, is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 23 and to transfer this case to the Southern District of Texas without delay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/12/2022) (ama) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

23 #6

Text of Proposed Order proposed Order

23 #5

Exhibit Email

23 #2

Exhibit Docket Sheet

23 #1

Exhibit Declaration of JBD

23 #23

Main Document

4 #5

Exhibit E

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#24) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 Brief, . Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, General Security Idemnity Company of AZ, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company..(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#1

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ZJZ Hospitality, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Appoint Arbitrator,. Document filed by United Specialty Insurance Company , Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company , General Security Idemnity Company of AZ.(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon( Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Case transferred in from New York Southern. Case Number 1:22-cv-00391; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER: granting #23 Motion to Transfer Case. For the reasons stated on the record during the hearing held on July 12, 2022, Respondent's motion to transfer venue, Dkt. No. 23, is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 23 and to transfer this case to the Southern District of Texas without delay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/12/2022) (ama) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Docket(#29) ORDER. The Court will hold a conference with respect to Defendant's motion to transfer, Dkt. No. 23, on July 12, 2022 at 1:00 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #23 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by ZJZ Hospitality, Inc...(Durrett, Joseph) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#27) ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to file any opposition to Defendant's motion to transfer, Dkt. No. 23, on or before April 21, 2022. Defendant's reply, if any, is due on or before April 28, 2022 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DECLARATION of Jared T. Greisman in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, General Security Idemnity Company of AZ, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy).(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #23 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, General Security Idemnity Company of AZ, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company..(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 Brief, . Document filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, General Security Idemnity Company of AZ, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company..(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by ZJZ Hospitality, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of JBD, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Order, #4 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding, #5 Exhibit Email, #6 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order, #7 Notice).(Durrett, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ZJZ Hospitality, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jared Greisman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AZ. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ZJZ Hospitality, Inc., re: #1 Petition to Appoint Arbitrator,. Document filed by United Specialty Insurance Company , Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company , General Security Idemnity Company of AZ.(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of JARED T. GREISMAN, ESQ. re: #1 Petition to Appoint Arbitrator, . Document filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AZ, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Steadfast Insurance Company, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEF re: #1 Petition to Appoint Arbitrator, . Document filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON, GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AZ, INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY, QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Steadfast Insurance Company, UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY..(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION TO APPOINT ARBITRATOR. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25591921).Document filed by United Specialty Insurance Company , Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company , General Security Idemnity Company of AZ.(Greisman, Jared) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where QBE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant