This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2022 at 07:56:13 (UTC).

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02 et al v. Bufkin Enterprises L L C

Case Summary

On 11/26/2021 Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02 filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Bufkin Enterprises L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04069

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02

Lexington Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

HDI Global Specialty SE

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02

Lexington Insurance Co

General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona

Indian Harbor Insurance Co

H D I Global Specialty S E

Old Republic Union Insurance Co

Q B E Specialty Insurance Co

Defendant

Bufkin Enterprises, LLC

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heather Shawn Duplantis

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar (BR)

P O Box 4412

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-4412

Virginia Y Dodd

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar (BR)

P O Box 4412

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-4412

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

Other Attorneys

Wells Talbot Watson

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

Kevin Ross Sloan

Attorney at Gauthier Murphy & Houghtaling

3500 N Hullen St

Metairie, LA 70002

Meagan Nicole Johnson

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

 

Court Documents

12 #4

Exhibit 3 - Oppo to Mot to Consolidate

12 #3

Exhibit 2eg - Removal Order

12 #2

Exhibit 2eg - Removal Notice

12 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Dismissal

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Dismissal, #2 Exhibit 2eg - Removal Notice, #3 Exhibit 2eg - Removal Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Oppo to Mot to Consolidate)(aty,Watson, Wells) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Bufkin Enterprises L L C answer due 1/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/28/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Old Republic Union Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E. Bufkin Enterprises L L C served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (aty,Watson, Wells) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

7 #1

Proposed order Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order)(Attorney Wells Talbot Watson added to party Bufkin Enterprises L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Watson, Wells) Modified docket text on 12/20/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 12/20/2021)

1 #7

Civil cover sheet

1 #6

Exhibit "F" -- Glad Tidings Memorandum Order

1 #5

Exhibit "E" -- 11/17/21 Plaintiff's Response Letter

1 #4

Exhibit "D" -- Arbitration Demand Letter

1 #3

Exhibit "C" -- Petition

1 #2

Exhibit "B" -- 9/23/21 Letter from Plaintiff

1 #1

Exhibit "A" -- Insurance Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT "Petition to Compel Arbitrationand Stay Litigation with Incorporated Supporting Memorandum of Law against Bufkin Enterprises, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4907477) filed by Old Republic Union Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" -- Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit "B" -- 9/23/21 Letter from Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit "C" -- Petition, #4 Exhibit "D" -- Arbitration Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit "E" -- 11/17/21 Plaintiff's Response Letter, #6 Exhibit "F" -- Glad Tidings Memorandum Order, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla))(aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Dismissal, #2 Exhibit 2eg - Removal Notice, #3 Exhibit 2eg - Removal Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Oppo to Mot to Consolidate)(aty,Watson, Wells) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Bufkin Enterprises L L C answer due 1/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 12/28/2021. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Old Republic Union Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E. Bufkin Enterprises L L C served on 12/9/2021, answer due 12/30/2021. (aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (aty,Watson, Wells) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Wells Talbot Watson on behalf of Bufkin Enterprises L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2022. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint with consent. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Bufkin Enterprises L L C. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order)(Attorney Wells Talbot Watson added to party Bufkin Enterprises L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Watson, Wells) Modified docket text on 12/20/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate QBE Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate QBE Atlantic, LLC, Other Affiliate QBE Investments (North America), Inc., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Holdings Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group, Ltd. for Q B E Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate XL Reinsurance of America, Inc., Other Affiliate X.L. America, Inc., Other Affiliate XL Group Ltd., Other Affiliate AXA SA, Other Affiliate AXA XL for Indian Harbor Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Steadfast Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group, Ltd. for Steadfast Insurance Co; Corporate Parent General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Other Affiliate SCOR Reinsurance Company, Inc. for General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona; Corporate Parent Lexington Insurance Company for Lexington Insurance Co; Corporate Parent United Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State National Insurance Company, Inc. for United Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Old Republic Union Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Old Republic General Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Old Republic International Corp. for Old Republic Union Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Safety National, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Safety Specialty Insurance Co; Corporate Parent Syndicate 1861, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2121, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2987, Corporate Parent Syndicate 510, Corporate Parent Syndicate 33, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1301, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2988, Corporate Parent Syndicate 609, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1969, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2623, Corporate Parent Syndicate 3268, Corporate Parent Syndicate 727, Corporate Parent Syndicate 623, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2003, Corporate Parent Syndicate 4444, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1886, Corporate Parent Syndicate 5886, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1183, Corporate Parent Syndicate 2010, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1686, Corporate Parent Syndicate 1856, Corporate Parent Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02, Other Affiliate Hannover Re, Other Affiliate PartnerRe Ltd., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Kiln Group Limited, Other Affiliate Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate QBE Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate QBE European Operations, Other Affiliate QBE Insurance Group, Other Affiliate Brit Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Brit UW Limited, Other Affiliate Hiscox Syndicates Limited, Other Affiliate Hiscox Ltd., Other Affiliate StarStone Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate StarStone Insurance Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate IQUW Syndicate Management Limited, Other Affiliate AXIS Managing Agency Ltd., Other Affiliate Asta Managing Agency Ltd., Other Affiliate Asta Capital Ltd., Other Affiliate Asta Capital Limited, Other Affiliate Talbot Underwriting Ltd., Other Affiliate Talbot Underwritings Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate American International Group Inc., Other Affiliate Argenta Syndicate Management Limited, Other Affiliate Argenta Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Hannover Ruck SE, Other Affiliate Talanx AG, Other Affiliate Haftpflichtverbnad der Deutschen Industrie V.a.G., Other Affiliate Cathedral Underwriting Ltd., Other Affiliate Cathedral Capital Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Lancashire Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Beazley Furlonge Limited, Other Affiliate Beazley Furlonge Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Catlin Underwriters Agencies Limited, Other Affiliate Catlin Syndicate Limited, Other Affiliate Apollo Syndicate Management Limited, Other Affiliate Apollo Partners, LLP, Other Affiliate DCB Ibeson, Other Affiliate Metacomet LLC, Other Affiliate SAC White, Other Affiliate Brit Insurance Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Brit Limited, Other Affiliate Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Other Affiliate Atruim Underwriters Limited, Other Affiliate Atrium Group Limited, Other Affiliate Enstar Group Limited, Other Affiliate Inter Hannover (No. 1) Ltd., Other Affiliate PartnerRe Corporate Ltd., Other Affiliate Exor Nederland N.V., Other Affiliate SCOR Underwriting Limited, Other Affiliate SCOR SE, Other Affiliate Beazley PLC, Other Affiliate S.A. Meacock & Company Limited, Other Affiliate Canopius Managing Agents, Ltd., Other Affiliate Canopius Holdings UK, Ltd., Other Affiliate Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Insurance Inc., Other Affiliate Sompo Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate AmTrust Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Canopius Group Limited for Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02; Corporate Parent HDI Global Specialty SE, Other Affiliate Hannover Ruck SE for H D I Global Specialty S E. (aty,Dodd, Virginia) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Heather Shawn Duplantis on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Londoin Subscribing to Policy No AMR-63188-02, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bufkin Enterprises L L C. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • DocketJudge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued as to Bufkin Enterprises, LLC, submitted by Old Republic Union Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE. (aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT "Petition to Compel Arbitrationand Stay Litigation with Incorporated Supporting Memorandum of Law against Bufkin Enterprises, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4907477) filed by Old Republic Union Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" -- Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit "B" -- 9/23/21 Letter from Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit "C" -- Petition, #4 Exhibit "D" -- Arbitration Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit "E" -- 11/17/21 Plaintiff's Response Letter, #6 Exhibit "F" -- Glad Tidings Memorandum Order, #7 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Londoin Subscribing to Policy No. AMR-63188-02(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Shawn Duplantis added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla))(aty,Duplantis, Heather) (Entered: 11/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant

Latest cases where SAFETY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant