This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 09:05:07 (UTC).

Cerny v. Norfolk Southern

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Cerny filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Norfolk Southern. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Damon R Leichty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00814

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Cerny

Defendants

Norfolk Southern Corporation

Norfolk Southern

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David L Farnbauch

Attorney at Sweeney Law Firm - FW/IN

8109-B Lima Road

Fort Wayne, IN 46818

Defendant Attorneys

David Alan Locke

Attorney at Stuart & Branigin LLP - Laf/IN

300 Main St Ste 900, Po Box 1010

Lafayette, IN 47902-1010

Tyler L Jones

Attorney at Stuart & Branigin LLP - Laf/IN

300 Main St Ste 900, Po Box 1010

Lafayette, IN 47902-1010

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern.(Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern. (Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern. (Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#7

(#7) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Norfolk Southern ; answer due by November 23, 2020. (Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler L Jones on behalf of Norfolk Southern (Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David Alan Locke on behalf of Norfolk Southern (Locke, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons filed by John Cerny. Norfolk Southern served on 10/05/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Farnbauch, David) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David L Farnbauch on behalf of John Cerny (Farnbauch, David) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Norfolk Southern Corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4355592.), filed by John Cerny. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Farnbauch, David) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern.(Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern. (Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern. (Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer now due 11/23/20 per #7 Agreed Notice. (jld) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Norfolk Southern ; answer due by November 23, 2020. (Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler L Jones on behalf of Norfolk Southern (Jones, Tyler) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David Alan Locke on behalf of Norfolk Southern (Locke, David) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons filed by John Cerny. Norfolk Southern served on 10/05/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Farnbauch, David) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketJudge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. ***NEW CASE*** (mrm) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David L Farnbauch on behalf of John Cerny (Farnbauch, David) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Norfolk Southern Corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4355592.), filed by John Cerny. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Farnbauch, David) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less