This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2022 at 09:04:06 (UTC).

Cerda v. Ally Financial et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 Cerda filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Ally Financial. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-05188

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesus Cerda

Santa Rosa,, CA 95403

Defendants

ALLY FINANCIAL

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

COMENITY BANK EXPRESS

CREDIT ONE BANK NA

DISCOVER BIN SVCS LLC

ISAC

MACYS/DSNB

SYNBC/CARE CREDIT

Ability Recovery Services

CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING

COMCAST

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYST

AES/SUNTRUST BANK

ILL STUDENT ASST. CO

EXPERIAN

TRANS UNION LLC

EQUIFAX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Peter Yould

Attorney at Troutman Pepper

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ally Financial (Yould, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2022) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ally Financial (Yould, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2022) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, To Extend Time to Respond filed by Ally Financial. (Yould, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2022) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Yould (Yould, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2022) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

9 #1

Envelope

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Envelope

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Envelope

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

3 #1

Envelope

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ally Financial (Yould, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2022) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ally Financial (Yould, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2022) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, To Extend Time to Respond filed by Ally Financial. (Yould, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2022) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Yould (Yould, Peter) (Filed on 11/8/2022) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesus Cerda re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2022) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesus Cerda re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued, #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2022) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jesus Cerda. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2022) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/14/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/27/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022)Any n on-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to AES/Suntrust Bank, Ability Recovery Services, Ally Financial, CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA, COMENITY BANK EXPRESS, CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, CREDIT ONE BANK NA, Comcast, DISCOVER BIN SVCS LLC, Equifax, Experian, ILL STUDENT ASST. CO, ISAC, Jefferson Capital Syst, Macys/DSNB, SYNBC/CARE CREDIT, Trans Union LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2022) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2022: #1 Envelope) (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AES/SUNTRUST BANK, ALLY FINANCIAL, Ability Recovery Services, CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA, COMCAST, COMENITY BANK EXPRESS, CONVERGENT OUTSOURCING, CREDIT ONE BANK NA, DISCOVER BIN SVCS LLC, EQUIFAX, EXPERIAN, ILL STUDENT ASST. CO, ISAC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYST, MACYS/DSNB, SYNBC/CARE CREDIT (Filing fee $ 402-34611161204.). Filed byJesus Cerda. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2022) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2022: #2 receipt) (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2022: #3 Envelope) (hdj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUIFAX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMCAST CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Credit One Bank, N.A. is a litigant