This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2022 at 08:34:42 (UTC).

CEPULEVICIUS v. ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 CEPULEVICIUS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julien Xavier Neals and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-20332

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julien Xavier Neals

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVALDAS CEPULEVICIUS

Defendant

ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN J. PISANO

123 North Union Avenue, Po Box 705

Cranford, NJ 07016

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH S. KAVESH

Attorney at KIERNAN TREBACH LLP

2001 Route 46, Suite 502

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet JS-44

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH S. KAVESH on behalf of ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE (KAVESH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#4

(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Arbella Mutual Insurance Company.. (KAVESH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Arbella Mutual Insurance Company.. (KAVESH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH S. KAVESH on behalf of ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE (KAVESH, JOSEPH) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ARBELLA MUTUAL INSURANCE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13019941) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EVALDAS CEPULEVICIUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44)(PISANO, JOHN) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arbella Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant