This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 08:47:13 (UTC).

CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY v. THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03561

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Appellant

CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY

Appellee

THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

JASON F. KING

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP

382 Springfield Avenue

Summit, NJ 07901

MARK C. ERRICO

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP

382 Springfield Avenue

Summit, NJ 07869

MARK D. SHERIDAN

Attorney at PATTON BOGGS LLP

One Riverfront Plaza

Newark, NJ 07102

Appellee Attorneys

RICHARD D. TRENK

Attorney at McManimon, Scotland & Baumann, LLC

75 Livingston Avenue, Suite 201

Roseland, NJ 07068

ROBERT S. ROGLIERI

Attorney at McManimon, Scotland & Baumann, LLC

75 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal by Century Indemnity Company (TRENK, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK C. ERRICO on behalf of CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY (ERRICO, MARK) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK D. SHERIDAN on behalf of CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY (SHERIDAN, MARK) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Brief

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal by Century Indemnity Company by THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TRENK, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

5 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) Exhibit to #4 Appellant's Brief Appendix of Appellant's Opening Brief by CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHERIDAN, MARK) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

3 #1

Transmittal

#3

(#3) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues by CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Noel L. Hillman, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(tf, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT S. ROGLIERI on behalf of THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY (ROGLIERI, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

TRANSMITTAL

1 #1

ORDER

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JASON F. KING terminated. (ERRICO, MARK) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certificate of Service #9 submitted by R. Trenk on 4/15/2021 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal by Century Indemnity Company (TRENK, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK C. ERRICO on behalf of CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY (ERRICO, MARK) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MARK D. SHERIDAN on behalf of CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY (SHERIDAN, MARK) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal by Century Indemnity Company. Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal by Century Indemnity Company by THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TRENK, RICHARD) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Exhibit to #4 Appellant's Brief Appendix of Appellant's Opening Brief by CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHERIDAN, MARK) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Appellant's BRIEF by CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHERIDAN, MARK) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues by CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Noel L. Hillman, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(tf, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT S. ROGLIERI on behalf of THE DIOCESE OF CAMDEN, NEW JERSEY (ROGLIERI, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-21257, filed by CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 ORDER, #2 TRANSMITTAL, #3 Exhibit)(pr, ) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Diocese of Camden, New Jersey is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant