This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2021 at 10:14:48 (UTC).

Century Indemnity Company et al v. Architectural Woods Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Century Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Architectural Woods Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J Richard Creatura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05112

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Richard Creatura

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company

Cigna Fire Underwriters Insurance Co., formerly known as Aetna Fire Underwriters Ins. Co.

Pacific Employers Insurance Company

Cigna Property & Casualty Insurance Company, formerly known as Aetna Insurance Company

Century Indemnity Company

Cigna Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Cigna Fire Underwriters Insurance Company

Aetna Insurance Company

Aetna Fire Underwriters Insurance Co

Defendants

Architectural Woods Inc.

Taft Properties, LLC

Taft Properties LLC

Architectural Woods Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

R Lind Stapley

Attorney at SOHA & LANG PS

1325 Fourth Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98101-2570

Kyle M. Butler

Attorney at SOHA & LANG PS

1325 Fourth Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98101-2570

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corp, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate Brandywine Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Century Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Century Indemnity Company (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corp, Other Affiliate INA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Pacific Employers Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Employers Insurance Company (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corp, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate INA Holdings Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corp, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., Other Affiliate INA Holdings Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:20-cv-05291, by Plaintiffs ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE TO FILER: re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 2/22/2021. (MET) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Breach of Contract, and Unjust Enrichment against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6938441) Attorney R Lind Stapley added to party ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney R Lind Stapley added to party Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney R Lind Stapley added to party Century Indemnity Company(pty:pla), Attorney R Lind Stapley added to party Pacific Employers Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corp, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate Brandywine Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Century Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Century Indemnity Company (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corp, Other Affiliate INA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Pacific Employers Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Employers Insurance Company (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corp, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate INA Holdings Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corp, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., Other Affiliate INA Holdings Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 3:20-cv-05291, by Plaintiffs ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, Pacific Employers Insurance Company. (Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO FILER: re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 2/22/2021. (MET) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/23/2021. (AMD) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketJudge J Richard Creatura added. (AMD) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Breach of Contract, and Unjust Enrichment against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6938441) Attorney R Lind Stapley added to party ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney R Lind Stapley added to party Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney R Lind Stapley added to party Century Indemnity Company(pty:pla), Attorney R Lind Stapley added to party Pacific Employers Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stapley, R) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AETNA INSURANCE COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co. is a litigant