This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2020 at 11:47:33 (UTC).

Central States Trucking Co. v. Morgan et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Central States Trucking Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Morgan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Central States Trucking Co.

Defendants

Tiger Trans LLC

Amber Small

Andrea Morgan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Destiny Smith Washington

Attorney at Ford & Harrison, LLP

271 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 1900

Atlanta, GA 30363

Jeffrey D. Mokotoff

Attorney at Ford & Harrison, LLP

271 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 1900

Atlanta, GA 30363

Anthony Robert Casella

Attorney at Weiner, Shearouse, Weitz, Greenberg & Shawe, LLP

14 East State Street, P.O. Box 10105

Savannah, GA 31412-5464

Defendant Attorney

Joseph H. Barrow

Attorney at Barrow & Ballew, PC

P.O. Box 8186

Savannah, GA 31412

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER re #29 MOTION for Interlocutory Order filed by Andrea Morgan, Central States Trucking Co., Tiger Trans LLC, Amber Small. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 8/8/20. (jgb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#29

(#29) CONSENT MOTION for Interlocutory Order by Central States Trucking Co., Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (jgb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

27 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Trey Simmons

27 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Susan Mahan

#27

(#27) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central States Trucking Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan Mahan, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Trey Simmons)(Washington, Destiny) Modified on 8/10/2020 (jlh). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#26

(#26) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central States Trucking Co. filed by Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (Barrow, Joseph) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Protective Order, subject to the modifications herein. Protective Order attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/30/2020. (pts) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

24 #1

Exhibit

#24

(#24) Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Central States Trucking Co.. Responses due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Casella, Anthony) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

7 #1

Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Injun

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central States Trucking Co. identifying Forward Air Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (Washington, Destiny) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#5

(#5) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Central States Trucking Co.. (Washington, Destiny) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (jrb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

3 #1

Litigants' Bill of Rights

#3

(#3) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

1 #2

Declaration of Tom Powers

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Central States Trucking Co. Filing Fee $400.00, AGASDC-2870803. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Tom Powers)(jrb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER re #29 MOTION for Interlocutory Order filed by Andrea Morgan, Central States Trucking Co., Tiger Trans LLC, Amber Small. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 8/8/20. (jgb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Interlocutory Injunction scheduled for 8/10/2020 02:30 PM in Savannah - 3rd Floor before Judge William T. Moore, Jr. is CANCELLED. (jgb) (Entered: 08/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CONSENT MOTION for Interlocutory Order by Central States Trucking Co., Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (jgb) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central States Trucking Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan Mahan, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Trey Simmons)(Washington, Destiny) Modified on 8/10/2020 (jlh). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Central States Trucking Co. filed by Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (Barrow, Joseph) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Protective Order, subject to the modifications herein. Protective Order attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/30/2020. (pts) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #24 Consent MOTION for Protective Order. (csr) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Central States Trucking Co.. Responses due by 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Casella, Anthony) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion for Interlocutory Injunction is scheduled for 8/10/2020 02:30 PM in Savannah - 3rd Floor before Judge William T. Moore, Jr. (jgb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Robert Casella on behalf of Central States Trucking Co. (Casella, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States Trucking Co. Andrea Morgan served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Washington, Destiny) Modified on 7/8/2020 (loh). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Tiger Trans LLC answer due 7/21/2020. (jrb) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Patricia Santos on behalf of Tiger Trans, LLC on June 30, 2020, filed by Central States Trucking Co.. (Washington, Destiny) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Central States Trucking Co.. Responses due by 7/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Washington, Destiny) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central States Trucking Co. identifying Forward Air Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (Washington, Destiny) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Central States Trucking Co.. (Washington, Destiny) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Andrea Morgan, Amber Small, Tiger Trans LLC. (jrb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Central States Trucking Co. Filing Fee $400.00, AGASDC-2870803. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Tom Powers)(jrb) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less