This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:26:00 (UTC).

Central Marine Logistics, Inc. et al v. Cojocaru

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Central Marine Logistics, Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Cojocaru. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher A. Boyko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02838

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher A. Boyko

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M/V Joseph L Block

Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC

Central Marine Logistics, Inc.

Arcelormittal USA LLC

Defendant

Octavian Cojocaru

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sandra M. Kelly

Attorney at Ray Robinson Law

6100 Oak Tree Blvd.

Cleveland, OH 44131

Christopher D. Kuebler

Attorney at Ray Robinson Law

6100 Oak Tree Blvd.

Cleveland, OH 44131

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Arcelormittal USA LLC, Central Marine Logistics, Inc., Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC, M/V Joseph L Block. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Arcelormittal USA LLC, Central Marine Logistics, Inc., Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC, M/V Joseph L Block. (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Octavian Cojocaru. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons, filed by Arcelormittal USA LLC, Central Marine Logistics, Inc., Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC, M/V Joseph L Block. Related document(s) #1 . (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit Dr Coale report

1 #7

Exhibit Dr. Craciun

1 #6

Exhibit Earnings Spreadsheet 2012 - current

1 #5

Exhibit Incident Report

1 #4

Exhibit Vessel Employment Record

1 #3

Exhibit Certificate of Documentation

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against Octavian Cojocaru. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9664795. Filed by M/V Joseph L Block, Central Marine Logistics, Inc., Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC, Arcelormittal USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Documentation, #4 Exhibit Vessel Employment Record, #5 Exhibit Incident Report, #6 Exhibit Earnings Spreadsheet 2012 - current, #7 Exhibit Dr. Craciun, #8 Exhibit Dr Coale report) (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Arcelormittal USA LLC, Central Marine Logistics, Inc., Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC, M/V Joseph L Block. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAs of January 6, 2020 Judge Christopher Boyko has taken Senior Status. Effective February 3, 2020, Judge Boyko is moving his chambers to the Howard Metzenbaum Courthouse located at 201 Superior Avenue, Cleveland, Ohio 44114. His office will be located in the East Chambers Rm 328. The Court will maintain courtroom facilities at Courtroom 15B of the Carl B. Stokes Courthouse so please consult the docket for the location of any upcoming proceedings. The phone number will remain 216 357-7151 so any telephonic conferences will not be affected by the change in location. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Arcelormittal USA LLC, Central Marine Logistics, Inc., Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC, M/V Joseph L Block. (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that Central Marine Logistics, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Octavian Cojocaru. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons, filed by Arcelormittal USA LLC, Central Marine Logistics, Inc., Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC, M/V Joseph L Block. Related document(s) #1 . (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for Declaratory Judgment against Octavian Cojocaru. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9664795. Filed by M/V Joseph L Block, Central Marine Logistics, Inc., Indiana Harbor Steamship Co., LLC, Arcelormittal USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Documentation, #4 Exhibit Vessel Employment Record, #5 Exhibit Incident Report, #6 Exhibit Earnings Spreadsheet 2012 - current, #7 Exhibit Dr. Craciun, #8 Exhibit Dr Coale report) (Kuebler, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.