This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 10:25:20 (UTC).

Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds v. M.D. Magary Construction Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against M D Magary Construction Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A. Beatty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00661

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Beatty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds

Defendants

M.D. Magary Construction Company

HOLLY CRAWFORD

Holly C. Crawford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chet A Kelly

Attorney at Kelly & Kelley, LLC

6 E. Washington Street

Belleville, IL 62220

Chet A. Kelly

Attorney at Kelly & Kelley, LLC

6 E. Washington Street

Belleville, IL 62220

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Holly C. Crawford, M.D. Magary Construction Company. (trb) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Entry of Default as to all defendants by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. M.D. Magary Construction Company served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. Holly C. Crawford served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Holly C. Crawford and to M.D. Magary Construction Company. Summonses returned to Attorney Kelly for service. (kls3) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-661-MAB. Consent due by 7/29/2020 (kls3) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Chet A Kelly on behalf of Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4221357.), filed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Holly C. Crawford, M.D. Magary Construction Company. (trb) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Entry of Default as to all defendants by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. M.D. Magary Construction Company served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. Holly C. Crawford served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Holly C. Crawford and to M.D. Magary Construction Company. Summonses returned to Attorney Kelly for service. (kls3) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-661-MAB. Consent due by 7/29/2020 (kls3) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Chet A Kelly on behalf of Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds (Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4221357.), filed by Central Laborers' Pension Welfare and Annuity Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Kelly, Chet) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less