This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2021 at 08:39:21 (UTC).

Central Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Roadsafe Traffic Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Central Laborers' Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Roadsafe Traffic Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. Guzman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03328

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. Guzman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Central Laborers' Welfare Fund

North Central Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund

Southern Illinois Laborers' Political League

Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund

SOUTHWEST ILLINOIS LABORERS' POLITICAL LEAGUE

Central Laborers' Pension Fund

Northern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund

Central Laborers' Annuity Fund

North Central Illinois Dues Checkoff

Southern Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust

North Central Vacation Fund

Southern Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund

Egyptian Builders & Organized Labor Together (EBOLT)

North Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund

North Central Illinois Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting

Southern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund

Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund

North Central Illinois Laborers' Building Fund

Southern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund

Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cecilia M. Scanlon

Stephen Jay Rosenblat

Other Attorneys

Carol A. Poplawski

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's second unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Defendant may answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 10/6/2021. Should the parties be unable to resolve their dispute by that date, they are directed to confer no later than 10/8/2021 to discuss deadlines for any Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures that have not already been exchanged and a proposed discovery plan. Plaintiffs are responsible for initiating such a conference, and all lead counsel for all parties must participate. In lieu of an initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written initial status report and proposed discovery plan by 10/15/2021. Failure or refusal to participate in such a conference or to cooperate in the preparation of the written report may constitute a basis for sanctions. After the Court receives the parties' written report, it will issue an order setting a discovery schedule if appropriate. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Defendant Roadsafe Traffic Systems, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,,,,,,, #1 Unopposed - Second Request (Poplawski, Carol) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time until 8/18/2021 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint #6 is granted. The parties are directed to confer no later than 8/20/2021 to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case, and they shall also discuss deadlines for any Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures that have not already been exchanged and a proposed discovery plan. Plaintiffs are responsible for initiating such a conference, and all lead counsel for all parties must participate. In lieu of an initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written initial status report and proposed discovery plan by 8/27/2021. Failure or refusal to participate in such a conference or to cooperate in the preparation of the written report may constitute a basis for sanctions. After the Court receives the parties' written report, it will issue an order setting a discovery schedule if appropriate. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Defendant Roadsafe Traffic Systems, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint,,,,,,, #1 (Unopposed) (Poplawski, Carol) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Roadsafe Traffic Systems, Inc. by Carol A. Poplawski (Poplawski, Carol) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Illinois & Iowa Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Political League, North Central Illinois Market Preservation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Building Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Political League, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, North Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, SOUTHWEST ILLINOIS LABORERS' POLITICAL LEAGUE, North Central Vacation Fund, South Central Illinois Vacation Fund, North Central Illinois Midwest Regional Organizing Committee, North Central Illinois Dues Checkoff, Southern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, Egyptian Builders & Organized Labor Together (EBOLT), Central Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Central Illinois Dues Checkoff, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Employers & Laborers' Local 100/397 Pension, Welfare and Annuity Funds, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, Illinois Laborers' Legislative Committee, North Central Illinois Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Central Laborers' Retiree Welfare Fund as to Roadsafe Traffic Systems, Inc. on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Scanlon, Cecilia) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Roadsafe Traffic Systems, Inc. (sxh, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, ) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Illinois Dues Checkoff, Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, Central Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, Central Laborers' Retiree Welfare Fund, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Egyptian Builders & Organized Labor Together (EBOLT), Employers & Laborers' Local 100/397 Pension, Welfare and Annuity Funds, Illinois Laborers' Legislative Committee, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, North Central Illinois Dues Checkoff, North Central Illinois Laborers' Building Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, North Central Illinois Market Preservation Fund, North Central Illinois Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, North Central Illinois Midwest Regional Organizing Committee, North Central Vacation Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Political League, Northern Illinois & Iowa Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, SOUTHWEST ILLINOIS LABORERS' POLITICAL LEAGUE, South Central Illinois Vacation Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Political League, Southern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Southern Illinois Vacation Fund, Southwest Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Southwestern Illinois Dues Checkoff, Southwestern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund by Stephen Jay Rosenblat (Rosenblat, Stephen) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Illinois Dues Checkoff, Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, Central Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, Central Laborers' Retiree Welfare Fund, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Egyptian Builders & Organized Labor Together (EBOLT), Employers & Laborers' Local 100/397 Pension, Welfare and Annuity Funds, Illinois Laborers' Legislative Committee, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, North Central Illinois Dues Checkoff, North Central Illinois Laborers' Building Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, North Central Illinois Market Preservation Fund, North Central Illinois Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, North Central Illinois Midwest Regional Organizing Committee, North Central Vacation Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Political League, Northern Illinois & Iowa Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, SOUTHWEST ILLINOIS LABORERS' POLITICAL LEAGUE, South Central Illinois Vacation Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Political League, Southern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Southern Illinois Vacation Fund, Southwest Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Southwestern Illinois Dues Checkoff, Southwestern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund by Cecilia M. Scanlon (Scanlon, Cecilia) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Northern Illinois & Iowa Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Political League, North Central Illinois Market Preservation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Building Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Political League, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, North Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, SOUTHWEST ILLINOIS LABORERS' POLITICAL LEAGUE, Southwestern Illinois Dues Checkoff, North Central Vacation Fund, South Central Illinois Vacation Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, North Central Illinois Midwest Regional Organizing Committee, North Central Illinois Dues Checkoff, Southern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, Egyptian Builders & Organized Labor Together (EBOLT), Southwestern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Work Dues Fund, Central Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Central Illinois Dues Checkoff, Southern Illinois Vacation Fund, Southern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Welfare Fund, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors' Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Southwest Illinois Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Employers & Laborers' Local 100/397 Pension, Welfare and Annuity Funds, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, Illinois Laborers' Legislative Committee, North Central Illinois Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Central Laborers' Retiree Welfare Fund; N. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18375700. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scanlon, Cecilia) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less