This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2022 at 07:29:40 (UTC).

Central Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 Central Laborers' Pension Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Preferred Concrete Excavating, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Franklin U. Valderrama and Heather K. McShain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01248

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

Referral Judge

Heather K. McShain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Central Laborers' Pension Fund

North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund

Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund

Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund

Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund

Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust

Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc.

Midwest Region Organization Committee

Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund

Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund

Defendants

Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc.

GERALD HARTMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A. Toth

Attorney at Georges & Synowiecki, Ltd.

20 S. Clark St., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60603-1903

Defendant Attorneys

Todd Abraham Miller

Attorney at Allocco, Miller & Cahill, P.C.

20 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 3517

Chicago, IL 60606-2806

Kathleen Marie Cahill

Attorney at Allocco, Miller & Cahill, P.C.

20 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 3517

Chicago, IL 60606-2806

Megan Marie Moore

Attorney at Allocco, Miller & Cahill, P.C.

20 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 3517

Chicago, IL 60606-2806

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #16 and adopts the parties' proposed discovery schedule as follows: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 05/31/2022. Written discovery requests to be issued by 06/30/2022. All fact discovery to be completed by 10/31/2022. A joint status report is due on 07/05/2022 to update the Court on: (a) the progress of discovery; (b) the status of settlement discussions, if any; and (c) any other issues the parties wish to raise with the Court. The parties may contact the Court at any time (by email to Chambers_McShain@ilnd.uscourts.gov) if they would like the Court's assistance with settlement. Mailed notice. (pk, ) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#16

(#16) STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc., Midwest Region Organization Committee, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#15

(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: A joint status report was due on 04/19/2022 #14 but was not filed. The parties must file the joint status report by 04/26/2022. Mailed notice. (pk, ) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge McShain for discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters #13 . On or before 04/19/2022, the parties shall file a joint status report in accordance with Judge McShain's standing order for initial status reports (available on Judge McShain's website by clicking the link for "Initial Status Conference"). Mailed notice. (pk, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#13

(#13) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Heather K. McShain for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters. (axc) Mailed notice. (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entryMINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court refers discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters to Magistrate Judge McShain. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Gerald Hartman, Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc.(Miller, Todd) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc. by Todd Abraham Miller (Miller, Todd) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc. by Megan Marie Moore (Moore, Megan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc. by Kathleen Marie Cahill (Cahill, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc., Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Midwest Region Organization Committee, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund as to Gerald Hartman on 3/11/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 05/23/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc., Midwest Region Organization Committee, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund by Richard A. Toth (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc., Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Midwest Region Organization Committee, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19229486. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #16 and adopts the parties' proposed discovery schedule as follows: Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 05/31/2022. Written discovery requests to be issued by 06/30/2022. All fact discovery to be completed by 10/31/2022. A joint status report is due on 07/05/2022 to update the Court on: (a) the progress of discovery; (b) the status of settlement discussions, if any; and (c) any other issues the parties wish to raise with the Court. The parties may contact the Court at any time (by email to Chambers_McShain@ilnd.uscourts.gov) if they would like the Court's assistance with settlement. Mailed notice. (pk, ) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATUS Report (Joint Initial) by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc., Midwest Region Organization Committee, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: A joint status report was due on 04/19/2022 #14 but was not filed. The parties must file the joint status report by 04/26/2022. Mailed notice. (pk, ) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge McShain for discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters #13 . On or before 04/19/2022, the parties shall file a joint status report in accordance with Judge McShain's standing order for initial status reports (available on Judge McShain's website by clicking the link for "Initial Status Conference"). Mailed notice. (pk, ) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Heather K. McShain for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters. (axc) Mailed notice. (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entryMINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court refers discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters to Magistrate Judge McShain. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Gerald Hartman, Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc.(Miller, Todd) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc. by Todd Abraham Miller (Miller, Todd) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc. by Megan Marie Moore (Moore, Megan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc. by Kathleen Marie Cahill (Cahill, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc., Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Midwest Region Organization Committee, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund as to Gerald Hartman on 3/11/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants GERALD HARTMAN, Preferred Concrete & Excavating, Inc. (ey, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 05/23/2022 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Any nongovernmental corporate party that qualifies under the Rules is reminded of the requirement to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1/N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.2. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cxr, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc., Midwest Region Organization Committee, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund by Richard A. Toth (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Laborers-Employers Cooperation and Education Trust, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Midwest Region Foundation For Fair Contracting, Inc., Great Plains Laborers' Vacation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Midwest Region Organization Committee, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund, Great Plains Laborers' District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund, Illinois Laborers and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19229486. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Toth, Richard) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northern Illinois and Iowa Laborers' Health and Welfare Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Northern Illinois Laborers' Annuity Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Plains Laborers Vacation Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Plains Laborers District Council Working Dues Check Off Fund is a litigant