This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 10:00:19 (UTC).

Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Zoie LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Central Illinois Carpenters Health Welfare Trust Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Zoie LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gilbert C. Sison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00461

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gilbert C. Sison

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois

Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund

Defendant

Zoie LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James R. Kimmey, III

Attorney at Cavanagh & OHara, LLP-Edwardsville

101 W. Vandalia St., Suite 245

Edwardsville, IL 62025

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#12) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #11 Clerk's Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kimmey, James) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#11

(#11) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Zoie LLC. (amv) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Zoie LLC served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Kimmey, James) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#7

(#7) ENTRY STRICKEN: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs on 06/16/2020. (Kimmey, James) Modified on 6/23/2020 (trb). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Zoie LLC and original mailed to Attorney Kimmey. (kdw) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-461-GCS. Consent due by 6/8/2020 (trb) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

2 #10

Summons

2 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #8

Exhibit H

2 #7

Exhibit G

2 #6

Exhibit F

2 #5

Exhibit E

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4182981.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Kimmey, James) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #11 Clerk's Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kimmey, James) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Zoie LLC. (amv) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Entry of Default by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kimmey, James) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Zoie LLC served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Kimmey, James) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #7 Return of Service Executed filed by Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois. Incorrect event selected. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Summons Returned Executed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil&Service of Process& Summons Returned Executed in order to properly trigger the answer due deadline. (trb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY STRICKEN: RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED by All Plaintiffs on 06/16/2020. (Kimmey, James) Modified on 6/23/2020 (trb). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Zoie LLC and original mailed to Attorney Kimmey. (kdw) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket(#5) Summons Requested. (Kimmey, James) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Kimmey, James) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Carpenters Pension Fund of Illinois, Central Illinois Carpenters Health & Welfare Trust Fund. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-461-GCS. Consent due by 6/8/2020 (trb) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4182981.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Kimmey, James) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Kimmey, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kimmey, James) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less