This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 21:09:10 (UTC).

Centner et al v. TMG Offshore Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Centner filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against TMG Offshore Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01032

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gina Centner

Paul Paradis

Defendants

TMG Offshore Incorporated

Mario Bauer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erik W Centner

Lerner & Rowe Law Group - Camelback Rd., 2701 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 140

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorneys

Kristy Leah Peters

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

Michael Bryce Guilliam

Attorney at Burns Barton LLP

2201 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 360

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #5

Exhibit 3-5

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20776979. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01032-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to TMG Offshore Incorporated. (BAC) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mario Bauer, TMG Offshore Incorporated. (Guilliam, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Mario Bauer, TMG Offshore Incorporated. (Guilliam, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/21/2022. (JAMA) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Mario Bauer, TMG Offshore Incorporated.(Peters, Kristy) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#8

(#8) *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alan A. Meda appearing for Gina Centner, Paul Paradis. (Meda, Alan) *Modified to correct event on 7/7/2022 (DXD). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/8/2022. (JAMA) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/8/2022. (JAMA) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alan A. Meda appearing for Gina Centner, Paul Paradis. (Meda, Alan) *Modified to correct event on 7/7/2022 (DXD). (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Mario Bauer, TMG Offshore Incorporated.(Peters, Kristy) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/21/2022. (JAMA) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Mario Bauer, TMG Offshore Incorporated. (Guilliam, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mario Bauer, TMG Offshore Incorporated. (Guilliam, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to TMG Offshore Incorporated. (BAC) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-20776979. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-01032-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-051501. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number AAZDC-20776979 filed by Mario Bauer, TMG Offshore Incorporated. (Guilliam, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3-5)(BAC) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristy Leah Peters