This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/18/2022 at 07:40:12 (UTC).

Centex Homes et al v. Peleus Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 Centex Homes filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Peleus Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Robbenhaar and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Robbenhaar

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

CENTEX HOMES dba CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION

CENTEX CONSTRUCTION OF NEW MEXICO, LLC

PULTE DEVELOPMENT NEW MEXICO, INC.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

PELEUS INSURANCE COMPANY

CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE fka INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE OF HANNOVER

SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD

COLORADO CASUALTY COMPANY

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY

DONEGAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY fka MOUNTAIN STATES MUTUAL CASUALTY COMPANY

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CLARENDON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, as successor in interest by way of merger with Sussex Insurance Company fka as Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company

FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

CENTURY SURETY COMPANY

UNITED SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

KNIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

GEMINI INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jared De Jong

Attorney at Payne & Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Sarah J Odia

Attorney at Payne & Fears LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Boulevard, Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Scott S. Thomas

Attorney at Payne & Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza, Ste. 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jay Graif

Attorney at Gust Rosenfeld P.L.C.

One East Washington Street, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Megan Elizabeth Ritenour

Attorney at Gust Rosenfeld PLC

1 E Washington Street, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Benjamin Branson

Attorney at The Cavanagh Law Firm, P.A.

1850 N Central Avenue, Suite 2400

Phoenix, AZ 85004

William M Demlong

Attorney at The Cavanagh Law Firm

1850 North Central, Suite 240

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Jill M Collins

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

8801 Horizon Blvd Ne, Suite 300

Albuquerque, NM 87113

Charles A. Armgardt

2844 East Main Street, Ste 106 #180

Farmington, NM 87401

Robert C. Evans

Attorney at Evans & Co.

823 E. 4Th Ave.

Durango, CO 81301

Jeffrey R. Taylor

Attorney at Rodey Dickason Sloan Akin & Robb, PA

Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Seth Sparks

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb

Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1888

Jeffrey Labovitch

Attorney at Nicolaides Fink Thorpe Michaelides Sulli

4250 Executive Square, Suite 540

La Jolla, CA 92037

Lloyd Hoffman

Attorney at Hoffman Kelley Lopez LLP

1700 Louisiana Blvd. Ne, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Dawn A. Hove

Attorney at Nicolaides Fink Thorpe Michaelides Sulli

4250 Executive Square, Suite 540

La Jolla, CA 92037

Jeffrey Leo Federspiel

Attorney at Hoffman Kelley Lopez LLP

1700 Louisiana Blvd. Ne, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Other Attorneys

Matthew A Pullen

Attorney at CRT Law & Professional Services, LLC

6608 Gulton Court Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Jacqueline M Woodcock

Attorney at Conklin Woodcock & Ziegler PC

320 Gold Ave Sw, Suite 800

Albuquerque, NM 87102

John K Ziegler

Attorney at Conklin, Woodcock & Ziegler, PC

320 Gold Ave Sw, Suite 1111

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#75

(#75) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Specialty Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#74

(#74) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc. by Knight Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc., Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC.(Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#73

(#73) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peleus Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#72

(#72) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc. by Peleus Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc., Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC.(Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#71

(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Elizabeth Ritenour on behalf of Gemini Insurance Company, Knight Specialty Insurance Company, Peleus Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#70

(#70) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gemini Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#69

(#69) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc. by Gemini Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc., Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC.(Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

67 #1

Exhibit A

67 #67

Main Document

#65

No Description Available

#64

No Description Available

#62

No Description Available

#61

No Description Available

#60

No Description Available

#56

No Description Available

#55

No Description Available

#54

No Description Available

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Specialty Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc. by Knight Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc., Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC.(Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peleus Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc. by Peleus Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc., Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC.(Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Elizabeth Ritenour on behalf of Gemini Insurance Company, Knight Specialty Insurance Company, Peleus Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gemini Insurance Company (Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc. by Gemini Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc., Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC.(Ritenour, Megan) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketAssociation Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8155989 re: # 68 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Labovitch, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docket(#68) ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA by Jeffrey Labovitch (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Labovitch, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company re 66 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Notice of Pro Hac Vice Counsel in Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Armgardt, Charles) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Doc 1 - Complaint, Doc 1-1 - Civil Cover Sheet, Doc 2 - Certificate of Interested Parties, and Doc 4 - Randomly Assigned to US Mag Judge John Robbenhaar served on COLORADO CASUALTY COMPANY, a New Hampshire corporation on 1/26/2022, filed by Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC, Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc.. (Odia, Sarah) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Doc 1 - Complaint, Doc 1-1 - Civil Cover Sheet, Doc 2 - Certificate of Interested Parties, and Doc 4 - Randomly Assigned to US Mag Judge John Robbenhaar served on CLARENDON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, as successor in interest by way of merger with Sussex Insurance Company fka as Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company, a Texas corporation on 1/26/2022, filed by Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC, Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc.. (Odia, Sarah) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Doc 1 - Complaint, Doc 1-1 - Civil Cover Sheet, Doc 2 - Certificate of Interested Parties, and Doc 4 - Randomly Assigned to US Mag Judge John Robbenhaar served on CENTURY SURETY COMPANY, an Ohio corporation on 1/26/2022, filed by Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC, Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc.. (Odia, Sarah) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Doc 1 - Complaint, Doc 1-1 - Civil Cover Sheet, Doc 2 - Certificate of Interested Parties, and Doc 4 - Randomly Assigned to US Mag Judge John Robbenhaar served on CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, an Ohio corporation on 1/26/2022, filed by Centex Construction of New Mexico, LLC, Centex Homes, Pulte Development New Mexico, Inc.. (Odia, Sarah) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Bitco General Insurance Company, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Century Surety Company, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Colorado Casualty Company, Donegal Mutual Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Knight Specialty Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Ohio Security Insurance Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, Peleus Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, The Cincinnati Casualty Company, The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Union Standard Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Westfield Insurance Company. (jg) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANMDC-8076037 (bp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by CENTEX CONSTRUCTION OF NEW MEXICO, LLC, CENTEX HOMES dba CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION, PULTE DEVELOPMENT NEW MEXICO, INC. CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (De Jong, Jared) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by CENTEX CONSTRUCTION OF NEW MEXICO, LLC, CENTEX HOMES dba CENTEX REAL ESTATE CORPORATION, PULTE DEVELOPMENT NEW MEXICO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(De Jong, Jared) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Colorado Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Peleus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cincinnati Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant