This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2020 at 10:04:18 (UTC).

CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudolph Contreras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01010

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rudolph Contreras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY

Defendants

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Courtney Turco DeThomas

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

Ryan O'Connor McMonagle

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 227

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Summons

#2

#3

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#4

#5

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/26/2020. (tj) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 26, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/22/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMonagle, Ryan) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/27/2020. (DeThomas, Courtney); Modified Date of Service and Answer deadline on 5/4/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY. (DeThomas, Courtney) Modified event/text on 4/20/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7034945) filed by CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan McMonagle