This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:42:04 (UTC).

Center for Forensic Psychiatry et al v. Kanerva

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Center for Forensic Psychiatry filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kanerva. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Center for Forensic Psychiatry

Meghan Rowland

People of the State of Michigan

Defendant

John R. Kanerva

Marquette, MI 49855

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Miscellaneous Attachments

#11

(#11) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for reconsideration re #4 #7 by defendant John R. Kanerva (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

10 #1

Miscellaneous Attachments

#10

(#10) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for reconsideration re #4 #7 by defendant John R. Kanerva (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for reconsideration re #4 #7 ("Public and Judicial Notice of Right to Speedy Jury Trial") by defendant John R. Kanerva (mlc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

8 #1

Response from Clerk Memo

7 #1

Miscellaneous Attachment

#7

(#7) MOTION for reconsideration re #4 by defendant John R. Kanerva; (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachment) (mlc) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Marquette County Circuit Court, of receipt of remanded case (mlc) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Marquette County Circuit Court (mlc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REMAND: case remanded to Marquette County Circuit Court; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE regarding waiving filing fee by defendant John R. Kanerva; (mlc) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Michigan 25th Circuit Court case number C.F.P. 1002272 filed by John R. Kanerva (mlc) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from defendant John R. Kanerva requesting docket sheet as taken from #11 ; mailed docket sheet to defendant (mlc) Modified text on 2/4/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for reconsideration re #4 #7 by defendant John R. Kanerva (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for reconsideration re #4 #7 by defendant John R. Kanerva (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for reconsideration re #4 #7 ("Public and Judicial Notice of Right to Speedy Jury Trial") by defendant John R. Kanerva (mlc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER from defendant John R. Kanerva regarding Copies of Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Response from Clerk Memo) (mlc) Modified filing date on 1/27/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for reconsideration re #4 by defendant John R. Kanerva; (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachment) (mlc) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Marquette County Circuit Court, of receipt of remanded case (mlc) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Order of Remand (no motion) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to John R. Kanerva (mlc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Marquette County Circuit Court (mlc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REMAND: case remanded to Marquette County Circuit Court; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to John R. Kanerva (mlc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE regarding waiving filing fee by defendant John R. Kanerva; (mlc) Modified text on 1/7/2020 (mlc). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of Michigan 25th Circuit Court case number C.F.P. 1002272 filed by John R. Kanerva (mlc) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.