This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2020 at 08:29:39 (UTC).

Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Environment Protection Agency et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Center for Biological Diversity filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against United States Environment Protection Agency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07664

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Center for Biological Diversity

Petitioner

Sentinel Peak Resources California LLC

Defendants

Andrew R. Wheeler

United States Environmental Protection Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clare Lakewood

Attorney at Center for Biological Diversity

1212 Broadway Street, Suite 800

Oakland, CA 94612

Maya Danielle Golden-Krasner

Attorney at Center for Biological Diversity

1212 Broadway Street, Suite 800

Oakland, CA 94612

Lauren Schanz Packard

Attorney at Center for Biological Diversity

1212 Broadway Street, Suite 800

Oakland, CA 94612

Petitioner Attorney

Michael Nathan Mills

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 1600

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #4

Corporate Disclosure Statement

8 #3

Proposed Answer to Complaint

8 #2

Proposed Order on Motion to Intervene

8 #1

Declaration of Jeremy Vanderziel in Support of Motion to Intervene

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Biological Diversity re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #2 Proposed Summons (Packard, Lauren) (Filed on 1/17/2020) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sentinel Peak Resources California LLC.. (Mills, Michael) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY (re #8 MOTION to Intervene ) filed bySentinel Peak Resources California LLC. (Mills, Michael) (Filed on 12/31/2019) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #8 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byCenter for Biological Diversity. (Golden-Krasner, Maya) (Filed on 12/27/2019) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Intervene filed by Sentinel Peak Resources California LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 12/31/2019. Replies due by 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Vanderziel in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Order on Motion to Intervene, #3 Proposed Answer to Complaint, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Mills, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Biological Diversity.. (Packard, Lauren) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Center For Biological Diversity (Packard, Lauren) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Packard, Lauren) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew R. Wheeler (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13913300.). Filed by Center For Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Packard, Lauren) (Filed on 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/21/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SENTINEL PEAK RESOURCES CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant