This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2021 at 11:10:20 (UTC).

Centauri Specialty Insurance Company v. Ryobi America Corp et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Centauri Specialty Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Ryobi America Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcia A. Crone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00488

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Centauri Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Ryobi America Corp

Ryobi North America Inc

Ryobi Technologies, Inc.

One World Technologies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Paul Nader

Attorney at Lobman, Carnahan

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorney

Allison Jayne Maynard

Attorney at Baker Hotstetler

2728 North Harwood St, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75202-3458

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons(es) One World

1 #3

Summons(es) Ryobi America

1 #4

Summons(es) Ryobi North America

1 #5

Summons(es) Ryobi Technologies

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi America Corp, Ryobi North America Inc, Ryobi Technologies, Inc. and emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kcv, ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Jayne Maynard on behalf of One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc. (Maynard, Allison) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc. (Maynard, Allison) Modified on 10/29/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference by 11/29/2021 and file a joint written report by 12/13/2021. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/29/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER to conduct Rule 26(f) conference by 11/29/2021 and file a joint written report by 12/13/2021. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/29/21. (tkd, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc. (Maynard, Allison) Modified on 10/29/2021 (tkd, ). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Jayne Maynard on behalf of One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc. (Maynard, Allison) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi America Corp, Ryobi North America Inc, Ryobi Technologies, Inc. and emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kcv, ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Centauri Specialty Insurance Company. (kcv, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (kcv, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8600868.), filed by Centauri Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Summons(es) One World, #3 Summons(es) Ryobi America, #4 Summons(es) Ryobi North America, #5 Summons(es) Ryobi Technologies)(Nader, James) (Attachment 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 replaced with flattened images on 9/28/2021) (kcv, ). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RYOBI TECHNOLOGIES, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ONE WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTAURI SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison J Maynard