This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2020 at 08:31:03 (UTC).

Censke v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Censke filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sally J. Berens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas A. Censke

Negaunee, MI 49866

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

 

Court Documents

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat recused from this case; case to be reassigned ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal on Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Commissioner of Social Security complete on 10/5/2020, answer due 12/4/2020 (slk) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (slk) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Thomas A. Censke (slk) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Notice Regarding Reassignment of Referral Judge After Recusal #5 , Order of Recusal #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Thomas A. Censke (ndj) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens after Order of Recusal #3 ; case is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Vermaat (slk) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) (DISREGARD) NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens for all further proceedings pursuant to order by Judge Maarten Vermaat ; (slk) Modified text on 9/24/2020 - notice did not attach (slk). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat recused from this case; case to be reassigned ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Thomas A. Censke; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (mlc) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Thomas A. Censke (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibits) (mlc) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less