This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2021 at 09:29:10 (UTC).

In re: In the Matter of Cenac Towing Co., LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 In re In the Matter of Cenac Towing Co , LLC was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin L.C. Feldman and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01349

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin L.C. Feldman

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Claimants

Cenac Towing Co., LLC

Florida Marine Transporters, LLC

Kirby Inland Marine, LP

Florida Marine, LLC

PBC Management, LLC

Jacqueline Berard

Shell Chemical LP

Shell Oil Company

Florida Marine Transporters, Inc.

Murphy Oil USA Inc

Murphy Oil USA, Inc.

Claimants and Consolidated Petitioners

Florida Marine Transporters, LLC

Kirby Inland Marine, LP

Florida Marine, LLC

PBC Management, LLC

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Claimant Attorneys

Mark Andrew Hill

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 2105

New Orleans, LA 70130

Randolph J. Waits

Attorney at Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, LLP

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2105

New Orleans, LA 70130

Matthew F Popp

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 2105

New Orleans, LA 70130

Anthony John Staines

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

Corey Patrick Parenton

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

James A. Crouch, Jr

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

Jason R. Kenney

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

Jessica Bankston Finley

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

J. Dwight LeBlanc, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Robert Patrick Ray

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

L. Eric Williams, Jr.

Attorney at Williams Law Office, LLC

3000 26Th Street, Suite A

Metairie, LA 70002

John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr.

Attorney at The Law Office of John J. Finckbeiner, Jr.

2203 Packenham Drive

Chalmette, LA 70043

Monique M. Weiner

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Mark Edward Best

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Perrey S. Lee

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

James M. Garner

Attorney at Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC

909 Poydras St., 28Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112-1033

Brandon William Keay

Attorney at Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC

909 Poydras St., 28Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112-1033

Christopher Chocheles

Attorney at Sher, Garner, Cahill, Richter, Klein & Hilbert, LLC

909 Poydras St., 28Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70112-1033

Claimant and Consolidated Petitioner Attorneys

Anthony John Staines

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

Corey Patrick Parenton

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

James A. Crouch, Jr

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

Jason R. Kenney

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

Jessica Bankston Finley

Attorney at Staines & Eppling (Metairie)

3500 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 820

Metairie, LA 70002

J. Dwight LeBlanc, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Robert Patrick Ray

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

(#25) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Lift Stay by Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 21-1349, 21-1372, 21-1406)(Finley, Jessica) Modified text on 9/9/2021 (bw). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

12 #4

Proposed Order

12 #3

Stipulations

12 #2

Memorandum in Support

12 #1

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

#12

(#25) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Lift Stay by Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 21-1349, 21-1372, 21-1406)(Finley, Jessica) Modified text on 9/9/2021 (bw). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

11 #3

Stipulations

11 #2

Memorandum in Support

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Proposed Order Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation

1 #7

Proposed Order Notice to Claimants

1 #6

Statement Stipulation for Costs

1 #5

Exhibit Letter of Undertaking

1 #3

Exhibit 3, Verification

1 #2

Exhibit 2, Declaration of Value

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#19) ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, of Kirby Inland Marine, LP for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1372)(Hill, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Extension. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date on all three Motions to Lift Stay (Rec. Docs. #5 , #11 , and #12 ) is continued to October 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/9/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(cbs) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Answer to Complaint, #16 Answer to Complaint. 1. Caption is formatted incorrectly and must be corrected prior to any additional filings. Pursuant to the consolidation of cases, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the lead consolidated case, ie, 21-1349, together with the docket numbers of all cases within the consolidation. Furthermore, the caption must indicate which case the document applies, or the notation "ALL CASES" if it applies to all cases. (Reference: 21-1372, 21-1349)(bw) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Lift Stay by Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 21-1349, 21-1372, 21-1406)(Finley, Jessica) Modified text on 9/9/2021 (bw). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint (Ct. R. Doc. 7) of Shell Oil Company and Shell Chemical LP in Cenac's Limitation Proceeding by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to Complaint (Ct. R. Doc.13) of Kirby Inland Marine, LP in Cenac's Limitation Proceeding by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to Complaint (Ct. R. Doc. 9) of Florida Marine, LLC, Florida Marine Transporters, LLC, and PBC Management, LLC in Cenac's Limitation Proceeding by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint (Ct. R. Doc.4) of William and Jacqueline Berard in Cenac's Limitation Proceeding by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, of Florida Marine, LLC and PBC Management, LLC for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1406)(Hill, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, of Kirby Inland Marine, LP for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability by Cenac Towing Co., LLC.(Reference: 2:21-cv-1372)(Hill, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Cenac Towing Co., LLC re #5 Ex Parte MOTION Lift Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Reference: 2:21-cv-1349)(Hill, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES - IT IS ORDERED that civil actions 21-1349, 21-1372, and 21-1406 are hereby CONSOLIDATED. Unless otherwise ordered, all future filings relating to such cases shall be made in the master case: 21-1349. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/25/2021. (Ref: 21-1349, 21-1372, 21-1406) (sa) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Florida Marine, LLC, PBC Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)Attorney Anthony John Staines added to party Florida Marine, LLC(pty:selreq), Attorney Anthony John Staines added to party PBC Management, LLC(pty:selreq).(Staines, Anthony) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent SCOGI GP, Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company, Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Chemical LP; Corporate Parent SCOGI GP, Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Oil Company (Best, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company.Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Shell Chemical LP(pty:clm), Attorney Mark Edward Best added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:clm).(Best, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Ex Parte MOTION to Lift Stay. Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 9/15/2021 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. No further action is necessary. (sa) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Lift Stay by Jacqueline Berard. Motion set for submission on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Stipulations, #4 Proposed Order)(Finckbeiner, John) Modified text/submission on 8/20/2021 (sa). (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER and CLAIM to #1 Complaint,, by Jacqueline Berard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letters of Testamentary) Attorney John Joseph Finckbeiner, Jr added to party Jacqueline Berard. (pty:clm).(Finckbeiner, John) Modified text/filers on 8/13/2021 (sa). (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE, AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 07/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(ko) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (aj) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM AND/OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8952543) filed by Cenac Towing Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Declaration of Value, #3 Exhibit 3, Verification, #4 Proposed Pleading Ad Interim Stipulation, #5 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking, #6 Statement Stipulation for Costs, #7 Proposed Order Notice to Claimants, #8 Proposed Order Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark Andrew Hill added to party Cenac Towing Co., LLC(pty:pet).(Hill, Mark) Modified text on 7/16/2021 (lw). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Marine Transporters, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHELL CHEMICAL LP is a litigant

Latest cases where MURPHY OIL USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kirby Inland Marine LP is a litigant