This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:44:30 (UTC).

Celltrion USA, Inc. v. Prime Healthcare Distributors LLC et al

Case Summary

On November 2, 2021, Celltrion USA, Inc. (“Celltrion” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Jeffrey Alan Simes of Goodwin Procter LLP, filed a contract lawsuit against Prime Healthcare Distributors LLC (“PHD”) and Lucy Ayoub (“Ayoub”) (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking monetary damages with prejudgment interest, costs, expenses and  attorneys’ fees for the Defendants’ alleged breaches of a November 23, 2020 Agreement (the “Agreement”), under which Celltrion supplied to Defendants DiaTrust™ COVID-19 Ag Rapid Tests. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of New York with Judges Rachel P. Kovner and Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. presiding. 

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Pursuant to the Agreement, Defendants agreed to purchase 8,000 DiaTrust™ test kits (comprising 200,000 tests) from Celltrion for agreed upon prices per kit. Defendants covenanted in the Agreement that they would make a “non-refundable, non-creditable, 100% advance payment” to Celltrion for the kits within three business days of invoicing from Celltrion.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “The Agreement further underscored that the sale was “final/non-returnable.” Although Celltrion issued an invoice to Defendants and made certain shipments of testing kits as Defendants requested, Defendants did not make the full payment required, nor have they returned testing kits that Celltrion shipped to them but which Defendants have not paid for.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendants are not authorized to distribute the DiaTrust™ tests in their possession, custody or control on behalf of Celltrion. On information and belief, PHD is defunct and Ms. Ayoub is not otherwise authorized to distribute DiaTrust™ tests. Also on information and belief, the test kits received from Celltrion have expired or soon will expire. For at least the foregoing reasons, Defendants cannot sell or distribute the DiaTrust™ tests in their possession, custody or control to customers.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out five claims for relief. The first claim is for alleged breach of contract. The second claim is for alleged breach of covenant of good faith and fair dealing. The third and fourth claims are for alleged unjust enrichment and alleged conversion, respectively. Lastly, the fifth claim is for declaratory judgment. The Plaintiff also claimed that the Defendants breached the Agreement by failing to pay for the DiaTrust™ testing kits when invoiced and by failing to return the kits which it received but for which it has not paid. The Defendants are in possession of approximately 20,000 DiaTrust™ tests for which the wDefendants never paid and which are the property of the Plaintiff. The Defendants also have refused to return the property of the Plaintiff and are exercising dominion over that property in derogation of the Plaintiff’s rights.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to enter judgment in favor of the Plaintiff and order that the Defendants pay all damages incurred by Plaintiff as a result of Defendants’ breaches of the Agreement. The Plaintiff further requested for prejudgment interest, costs, expenses, attorneys’ fees and such further and additional relief as the Court deems to be appropriate.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06100

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

Referral Judge

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Celltrion USA, Inc.

Defendants

Prime Healthcare Distributors LLC

Lucy Ayoub

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Alan Simes

Attorney at Goodwin, Procter LLP

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. by Celltrion USA, Inc. (Simes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Lucy Ayoub, Prime Healthcare Distributors LLC. (Herrera, Isaiah) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Celltrion USA, Inc. (Simes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING CASE: The notice of voluntary dismissal at #6 is so-ordered. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 11/17/2021. (Andrews, Stephen) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Celltrion USA, Inc. (Simes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Lucy Ayoub, Prime Healthcare Distributors LLC. (Herrera, Isaiah) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. by Celltrion USA, Inc. (Simes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lucy Ayoub, Prime Healthcare Distributors LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14993430 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Celltrion USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Simes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Celltrion, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey A Simes